This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2022 at 08:10:11 (UTC).

Electric Line Technologies, LLC et al v. Hunting Titan, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Electric Line Technologies, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hunting Titan, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian A. Jackson and Scott D. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00720

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

Referral Judge

Scott D. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Electric Line Technologies, LLC

DPM (Derouen's Precision Machine), LLC

Defendant

Hunting Titan, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan W Stewart

Attorney at Gibson Law Partners, LLC

Po Box 52124

Lafayette, LA 70505

James Huey Gibson

Attorney at Gibson Law Partners, LLC

P. O. Box 52124

Lafayette, LA 70505

Charles M. Kreamer

Attorney at Gibson Law Partners, LLC

P.O. Box 52124

Lafayette, LA 70505

Ted M. Anthony

Attorney at Babineaux, Poche, Anthony & Salvich, LLC

P. O. Box 52169

Lafayette, LA 70505-2169

Defendant Attorneys

Jason Marechal Cerise

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

601 Poydras Street, Suite 2660

New Orleans, LA 70130

Charles Baker

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

600 Travis, 2800 Jpmorgan Chase Tower

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #9 Unopposed Second Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 MOTION for Partial Dismissal / Motion to Dismiss DPM's Claims and Partial Motion to Dismiss ELT's Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Replies due by 4/28/2022. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/16/2022. (ELW) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DPM (Derouen's Precision Machine), LLC. (Gibson, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electric Line Technologies, LLC. (Gibson, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

10 #3

Proposed Order

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Proposed Pleading; Order

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss DPM's Claims and Partial Motion to Dismiss ELT's Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) on or before 2/23/2022. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/26/2022. (EDC) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

7 #1

Proposed Pleading; Order

7 #7

Main Document

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

6 #6

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #9 Unopposed Second Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 MOTION for Partial Dismissal / Motion to Dismiss DPM's Claims and Partial Motion to Dismiss ELT's Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Replies due by 4/28/2022. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/16/2022. (ELW) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DPM (Derouen's Precision Machine), LLC. (Gibson, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electric Line Technologies, LLC. (Gibson, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Charles Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 2/10/2022. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Charles Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2393973). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Ex Parte MOTION for Charles Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2393973) by Hunting Titan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Cerise, Jason) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed Second Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 MOTION for Partial Dismissal / Motion to Dismiss DPM's Claims and Partial Motion to Dismiss ELT's Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by DPM (Derouen's Precision Machine), LLC, Electric Line Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Gibson, James) Modified on 2/8/2022 to edit text (LLH). (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss DPM's Claims and Partial Motion to Dismiss ELT's Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) on or before 2/23/2022. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/26/2022. (EDC) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 MOTION for Partial Dismissal / Motion to Dismiss DPM's Claims and Partial Motion to Dismiss ELT's Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Electric Line Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Gibson, James) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Partial Dismissal / Motion to Dismiss DPM's Claims and Partial Motion to Dismiss ELT's Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Hunting Titan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Cerise, Jason) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Defendant, Hunting Titan, Inc., filed an #2 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings seeking a 21-day extension to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Considering the requirements of Local Rule 7(a) have been met, Defendant's motion is GRANTED. The deadline to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is now January 19, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 12/29/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 3/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 12/27/2021. (KAH) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hunting Titan, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hunting PLC for Hunting Titan, Inc... (Cerise, Jason) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Docket(#2) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Responsive Pleadings by Hunting Titan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cerise, Jason) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 713,598. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2376512), filed by Hunting Titan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Cerise, Jason) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less