This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2021 at 09:32:41 (UTC).

ELDRIDGE v. GERBER PRODUCTS CO.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 ELDRIDGE filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against GERBER PRODUCTS CO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire C. Cecchi and Mark Falk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-12910

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ana Lynette Gregory Eldridge

Defendants

BEECH-NUT NUTRITION COMPANY

JOHN DOE MANUFACTURERS

GERBER PRODUCTS CO.

In Re

Gerber Products Company Baby Food Litigation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GEOFFREY W. CASTELLO, III

Attorney at KELLEY DRYE & WARREN LLP

One Jefferson Road2Nd Floor

Parsippany, NJ 07054

GLENN T. GRAHAM

Attorney at KELLEY DRYE & WARREN LLP

One Jefferson Road

Parsippany, NJ 07054

 

Court Documents

#32

#31

30 #1

Exhibit A: Consolidation Order

#30

#29

27 #1

*Restricted*

#27

#26

#25

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES, etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 7/6/2021. (lag, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Proposed Order Consolidating Cases by GERBER PRODUCTS CO.. (CASTELLO, GEOFFREY) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Letter from Geoffrey W. Castello requesting a consolidation of actions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consolidation Order)(CASTELLO, GEOFFREY) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by GLENN T. GRAHAM on behalf of GERBER PRODUCTS CO. (GRAHAM, GLENN) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Appearance by GEOFFREY W. CASTELLO, III on behalf of GERBER PRODUCTS CO. (CASTELLO, GEOFFREY) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketJudge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (ps) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00283. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SEVER PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST GERBER FROM PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST BEECH-NUT; TRANSFER PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST GERBER TO THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY, NEWARK OFFICE AND CONSOLIDATE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST BEECH-NUT. Plaintiff's claims against Beech-Nut shall be consolidated with the pending Thomas and other actions consolidated before Judge McAvoy in Master File No. 1:21-cv-133. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 6/22/2021. (khr) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Sever Plaintiff's Claims Against Gerber from Plaintiff's Claims Against Beech-Nut; Transfer Plaintiff's Claims Against Gerber to the District of New Jersey, Newark Office; and Consolidated Plaintiff's Claims Against Beech-Nut by Gerber Products Co. submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel. (Merryman, Bryan) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER approving #23 Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer Decision filed by Gerber Products Co. [Case stayed]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 5/6/2021. (tab) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth A. Fegan Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5468496. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Clark, Melissa) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ana Lynette Gregory Eldridge. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Clark, Melissa) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beech-Nut Nutrition Company identifying Corporate Parent Hero Beteiligungen AG, Corporate Parent Hero USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Schwartau International GmbH, Corporate Parent AOH Nahrungsmittel GmbH & Co. KG for Beech-Nut Nutrition Company.. (McCarthy, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen E. McCarthy on behalf of Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (McCarthy, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ana Lynette Gregory Eldridge. Gerber Products Co. waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Clark, Melissa) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 6/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/7/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiffs Counsel, Attorney Elizabeth A. Fagan. Served by email at email address: beth@feganscott.com. Phone number of Counsel is: 312-741-1019. Admissions due by 3/26/2021. (map) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketJOHN DOE TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe defendant, in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue a summons for service of process on "John Doe" defendants at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain the defendants identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time.(map) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Beech-Nut Nutrition Company, and Gerber Products Co.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Gerber Products Co.)(map) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Beech-Nut Nutrition Company, Gerber Products Co., John Doe Manufacturers (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5454743) filed by Ana Lynette Gregory Eldridge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(map) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beech-Nut Nutrition Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Gerber Products Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geoffrey W. Castello