This case was last updated from PACER on 06/26/2020 at 09:59:14 (UTC).

ELDER v. KOLHOUSE et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 ELDER filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against KOLHOUSE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00221

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LLOYD T. ELDER, SR.

Vincennes, IN 47591

Defendants

THOMPSON

LAFFERTY

A. JACKSON

WILSON

DOBSON

MEAD

CARR

PARISH

KOLHOUSE

COX

RIPPEY

LYNN

A. JIVERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Taylor Lee Rasey

Attorney at KNIGHT, HOPPE, KURNIK & KNIGHT, LTD

233 East 84Th Drive, Suite 301

Merrillville, IN 46410

Matthew Scott Clark

Attorney at KNIGHT HOPPE KURNIK & KNIGHT LTD (Rosemont)

5600 North River Road, Suite 600

Rosemont, IL 60018-5114

Lisa A. Baron

Attorney at KNIGHT, HOPPE, KURNIK & KNIGHT, LTD.

233 East 84Th Drive, Suite 301

Merrillville, IN 46410

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Envelope

#25

(#25) MOTION to Recover Discovery, filed by Plaintiff LLOYD T. ELDER, SR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#24

(#24) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by KOLHOUSE. KOLHOUSE waiver sent on 5/28/2020. (Rasey, Taylor) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Scott Clark on behalf of Defendant KOLHOUSE. (Clark, Matthew) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Lee Rasey on behalf of Defendant KOLHOUSE. (Rasey, Taylor) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Baron on behalf of Defendant KOLHOUSE. (Baron, Lisa) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Lee Rasey on behalf of Defendant KOLHOUSE. (Rasey, Taylor) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

19 #1

Envelope

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Custody Status, filed by Plaintiff LLOYD T. ELDER, SR (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AAS) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

7 #1

Envelope

#6

(#7) RESPONSE re #6 Notice of Deficiency, filed by Plaintiff LLOYD T. ELDER, SR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#5

(#5) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by LLOYD T. ELDER, SR. (KAA) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#9) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - No initial partial filing fee is due at this time. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 5/26/2020. (JRB) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CARR, COX, DOBSON, A. JACKSON, A. JIVERS, KOLHOUSE, LAFFERTY, LYNN, MEAD, PARISH, RIPPEY, THOMPSON, WILSON, filed by LLOYD T. ELDER, SR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION to Recover Discovery, filed by Plaintiff LLOYD T. ELDER, SR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by KOLHOUSE. KOLHOUSE waiver sent on 5/28/2020. (Rasey, Taylor) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Scott Clark on behalf of Defendant KOLHOUSE. (Clark, Matthew) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Lee Rasey on behalf of Defendant KOLHOUSE. (Rasey, Taylor) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Baron on behalf of Defendant KOLHOUSE. (Baron, Lisa) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Lee Rasey on behalf of Defendant KOLHOUSE. (Rasey, Taylor) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Custody Status, filed by Plaintiff LLOYD T. ELDER, SR (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AAS) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR NO CONTACT AND MOTION TO RECOVER DISCOVERY - Plaintiff Lloyd Elder's motion for no contact, dkt. #13 , asking that the Court order the defendant to have no contact with him while he is in jail and after he is released is DENIED because the defendant has not yet appeared and answered the complaint and the motion does not sufficiently show that a no contact order is required. Mr. Elder's motion to recover discovery, dkt. #15 , is DENIED for the present. The defendant has not yet appeared or answered. SEE ORDER. COPY SENT TO PALINTNFF VIA US MAIL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/2/2020. (JRB) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Submission of Trust Account Summary, filed by Plaintiff LLOYD T. ELDER, SR. (TMC) Modified on 6/2/2020 - distribution to Plaintiff via US mail (TMC). (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCKETED IN ERROR***Submission of Trust Account Summary, filed by Plaintiff LLOYD T. ELDER, SR. (TMC) Modified on 6/2/2020 to edit text(TMC). (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order Severing Improperly Joined Claims, Dismissing Insufficient Claims, and Directing Opening of New Civil Actions - The plaintiff's improperly joined claims are severed. The failure to protect and diet claims against Sergeant Kolhouse shall proceed in this action and will be screened in a subsequent order. The clerk is directed to open four new civil actions as directed in Part III of this Order. The clerk is directed to terminate defendantsMead, Carr, Jivers, Jackson, Lynn, Dobson, Wilson, Parish, Thompson, Cox, Lafferty, and Rippey. Nothing in this Order prevents Mr. Elder from filing separate lawsuits raising the claims that were dismissed in this action if he can allege facts upon which he can state a claim for relief. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 5/27/2020.(JRB) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - No initial partial filing fee is due at this time. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 5/26/2020. (JRB) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Submission of Trust Account, filed by Plaintiff LLOYD T. ELDER, SR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE re #6 Notice of Deficiency, filed by Plaintiff LLOYD T. ELDER, SR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through June 15, 2020, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by LLOYD T. ELDER, SR. (KAA) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff LLOYD T. ELDER, SR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CARR, COX, DOBSON, A. JACKSON, A. JIVERS, KOLHOUSE, LAFFERTY, LYNN, MEAD, PARISH, RIPPEY, THOMPSON, WILSON, filed by LLOYD T. ELDER, SR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MEAD CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Dobson is a litigant

Latest cases where Lynn is a litigant

Latest cases where Carr is a litigant