This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2021 at 20:32:29 (UTC).

Spencer Elden v. Nirvana L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Spencer Elden filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Nirvana L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06836

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spencer Elden

Defendants

Nirvana L.L.C.

UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, INC., d/b/a INTERSCOPE RECORDS

The David Geffen Company

Geffen Records

Warner Records, Inc.

MCA Music Inc

Kirk Weddle

Kurt Cobain Estate of

Courtney Love

Heather Parry

Guy Oseary

Krist Novoselic

Chad Channing

David Grohl

Robert Fisher

Universal Music Group, Inc.

Kurt Cobain

MCA Records, Inc.

UMG Recordings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Yancy Lewis

Attorney at Marsh Law Firm PLLC

31 Hudson Yards 11Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

Defendant Attorney

Bert H Deixler

Attorney at Kendall Brill and Kelly LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 1725

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3206

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STIPULATION #17 , #18 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#19

(#19) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Kurt Cobain, Robert Fisher, Geffen Records, David Grohl, Courtney Love, Nirvana L.L.C., Krist Novoselic, The David Geffen Company, Universal Music Group, Inc., Kirk Weddle, MCA Records, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Spencer Elden(Lewis, Robert) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

18 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order based on Stipulation

18 #18

Main Document

17 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order based on Stipulation

17 #17

Main Document

#16

(#16) ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Stipulation #15 , for the following reasons: Document not properly formatted pursuant to Local Rule 11-3.2. A proposed order was not submitted to the chambers e-mail (FMO_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov) pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.2. (iv) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

15 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order based on Stipulation

15 #15

Main Document

#10

(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, ORDERING Motion to Intervene as Defendant received on 10/22/2021 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rule 6-1 Written notice of motion lacking or timeliness of notice incorrect. (iv) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STIPULATION #17 , #18 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Kurt Cobain, Robert Fisher, Geffen Records, David Grohl, Courtney Love, Nirvana L.L.C., Krist Novoselic, The David Geffen Company, Universal Music Group, Inc., Kirk Weddle, MCA Records, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Spencer Elden(Lewis, Robert) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Second STIPULATION for Order Stipulation to Accept Service by Email and Setting Date for Responding to Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Spencer Elden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order based on Stipulation)(Lewis, Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First STIPULATION for Order Stipulation to Accept Service by Email and Setting Date for Responding to Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Spencer Elden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order based on Stipulation)(Lewis, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Stipulation #15 , for the following reasons: Document not properly formatted pursuant to Local Rule 11-3.2. A proposed order was not submitted to the chambers e-mail (FMO_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov) pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.2. (iv) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) **STRICKEN** First STIPULATION for Order RE SERVICE AND FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff Spencer Elden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order based on Stipulation)(Lewis, Robert) Modified on 11/15/2021 Per Order #16 (iv). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE filed by plaintiff Spencer Elden. Notice of Eratta re Stipulation and Proposed Order (Lewis, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First STIPULATION for Order Stipulation to Accept Service by Email and Setting Date for Responding to Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Spencer Elden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order based on Stipulation)(Lewis, Robert) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Stipulation #10 , for the following reasons: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. (iv) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **STRICKEN** First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Proof of Service filed by plaintiff Spencer Elden.(Lewis, Robert) Modified on 11/12/2021 per Order #12 (iv). (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, ORDERING Motion to Intervene as Defendant received on 10/22/2021 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rule 6-1 Written notice of motion lacking or timeliness of notice incorrect. (iv) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RE: INITIAL PROCEEDINGS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Spencer Elden, (Lewis, Robert) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Spencer Elden. (Lewis, Robert) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31866596 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Spencer Elden. (Attorney Robert Yancy Lewis added to party Spencer Elden(pty:pla))(Lewis, Robert) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARNER RECORDS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NIRVANA UNLIMITED LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UMG Recordings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP INC. is a litigant