This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 05:50:21 (UTC).

Elbert v. Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Elbert filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00250

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amye Elbert

Defendant

Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hassan Ali Zavareei

Attorney at Tycko & Zavareei LLP

1828 L Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2020: #1 Summons) (amgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14062764.). Filed byAmye Elbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

5 #1

Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2020: #1 Summons) (amgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14062764.). Filed byAmye Elbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.