This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2019 at 07:01:04 (UTC).

Elasmar v. Loxo Oncology Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 Elasmar filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Loxo Oncology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00498

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katie Elasmar

Defendants

LOXO ONCOLOGY INC

Steve D Harr, MD

Avi Z Naider

Joshua H Bilenker, MD

Alan Fuhrman

Steve Elms

Lori A Kunkel, MD

Tim Mayleben

Keith T Flaherty, MD

Loxo Oncology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Eldridge Bower

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Katie Elasmar (Bower, David) (Filed on 2/12/2019) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13042050.). Filed byKatie Elasmar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Bower, David) (Filed on 1/28/2019) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Katie Elasmar (Bower, David) (Filed on 2/12/2019) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/12/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13042050.). Filed byKatie Elasmar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Bower, David) (Filed on 1/28/2019) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less