This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2019 at 07:48:33 (UTC).

ELANSARI v. PASSHE et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 ELANSARI filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against PASSHE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03005

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMRO ELANSARI

Exton, PA 19341

Defendants

PASSHE

JILL FLUKE

MICHAEL FERGUSON

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 6) IS GRANTED, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FILE THE AMENDED COMPLAINT & ATTACHED EXHIBITS AS A SEPARATE DOCKET ENTRY. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED AS LEGALLY FRIVOLOUS, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/26/19. 8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/26/19. 8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT THE LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED AND THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 07/15/2019. 07/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF ALONG WITH FORM FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT.(nds) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 07/15/2019. 07/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(nds) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #10 Notice of Appeal filed by AMRO ELANSARI. USCA Case Number 19-3020 (dmc, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEAL by PRO SE PLFF AMRO ELANSARIFP (IFP GRANTED) Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED" (kw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

9 #2

Exhibits - Part 2

9 #1

Exhibits - Part 1

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHAEL FERGUSON, JILL FLUKE, PASSHE, filed by PRO SE PLFF AMRO ELANSARI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Part 1, #2 Exhibits - Part 2)(kw, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

6 #4

Envelope

6 #3

Exhibits - Part 2

6 #1

Amended Complaint

#6

(#6) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED BY PRO SE PLFF AMRO ELANSARI.(AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED). (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibits - Part 1, #3 Exhibits - Part 2, #4 Envelope)(kw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#3

(#3) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against MICHAEL FERGUSON, JILL FLUKE, PASSHE, filed by AMRO ELANSARI. NO ENVELOPE.(jwl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#1

RESTRICTED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #10 Notice of Appeal filed by AMRO ELANSARI. USCA Case Number 19-3020 (dmc, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEAL by PRO SE PLFF AMRO ELANSARIFP (IFP GRANTED) Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED" (kw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHAEL FERGUSON, JILL FLUKE, PASSHE, filed by PRO SE PLFF AMRO ELANSARI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Part 1, #2 Exhibits - Part 2)(kw, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 6) IS GRANTED, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FILE THE AMENDED COMPLAINT & ATTACHED EXHIBITS AS A SEPARATE DOCKET ENTRY. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED AS LEGALLY FRIVOLOUS, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/26/19. 8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/26/19. 8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED BY PRO SE PLFF AMRO ELANSARI.(AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED). (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibits - Part 1, #3 Exhibits - Part 2, #4 Envelope)(kw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER THAT THE LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED AND THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 07/15/2019. 07/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF ALONG WITH FORM FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT.(nds) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 07/15/2019. 07/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(nds) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AMRO ELANSARI. (jwl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against MICHAEL FERGUSON, JILL FLUKE, PASSHE, filed by AMRO ELANSARI. NO ENVELOPE.(jwl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by AMRO ELANSARI..(jwl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less