This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2019 at 07:48:37 (UTC).

ELANSARI v. JAGEX INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 ELANSARI filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against JAGEX INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. KEARNEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03006

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK A. KEARNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMRO ELANSARI

Exton, PA 19341

Defendants

SHANGHAI FUKONG

NETWORK TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD.

JAGEX INC.

SHANGHAI HONGTOU

INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT CO. LTD.

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #6 Notice of Appeal filed by AMRO ELANSARI. USCA Case Number 19-2696 (dmc, ) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appeal filed by AMRO ELANSARI. IFP granted on 7/15/19 Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA and Appeals Clerk.(mbh, ) (NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. WE DISMISS THE COMPLAINT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/15/19. 7/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND UNREPS. (mbh, ) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/15/19. 7/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND UNREPS.(mbh, ) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#3

(#3) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against SHANGHAI FUKONG, SHANGHAI HONGTOU, INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT CO. LTD., JAGEX INC., NETWORK TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD., filed by AMRO ELANSARI. NO ENVELOPE.(jwl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #6 Notice of Appeal filed by AMRO ELANSARI. USCA Case Number 19-2696 (dmc, ) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appeal filed by AMRO ELANSARI. IFP granted on 7/15/19 Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA and Appeals Clerk.(mbh, ) (NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. WE DISMISS THE COMPLAINT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/15/19. 7/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND UNREPS. (mbh, ) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/15/19. 7/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND UNREPS.(mbh, ) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AMRO ELANSARI. (jwl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against SHANGHAI FUKONG, SHANGHAI HONGTOU, INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT CO. LTD., JAGEX INC., NETWORK TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD., filed by AMRO ELANSARI. NO ENVELOPE.(jwl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by AMRO ELANSARI..(jwl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jagex Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Network-1 Technologies, Inc. is a litigant