This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2020 at 09:52:09 (UTC).

Elaine Gipson v. Universal Recovery Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Elaine Gipson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Universal Recovery Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A Donahue, John F. Walter and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04459

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judges

Patricia A Donahue

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elaine Gipson

Defendant

Universal Recovery Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Previn A Wick

Attorney at Wick Legal Group

900 North Broadway Suite 218

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Defendant Attorneys

Lawrence K Iglesias

Attorney at Ellis Law Group LLP

1425 River Park Drive Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

Mark E Ellis

Attorney at Ellis Law Group LLP

1425 River Park Drive Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) DECLARATION of Lawrence K. Iglesias OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL filed by Defendant Universal Recovery Corporation. (Iglesias, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for August 10, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 27, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Universal Recovery Corporation, identifying Universal Recovery Corporation and Elaine Gipson. (Iglesias, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Universal Recovery Corporation.(Attorney Lawrence K Iglesias added to party Universal Recovery Corporation(pty:dft))(Iglesias, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elaine Gipson, upon Defendant Universal Recovery Corporation served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wick, Previn) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Universal Recovery Corporation. (lh) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Donahue. (lh) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ELAINE GIPSON. (Wick, Previn) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ELAINE GIPSON, (Wick, Previn) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ELAINE GIPSON. (Wick, Previn) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26475526 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ELAINE GIPSON. (Attorney Previn A Wick added to party ELAINE GIPSON(pty:pla))(Wick, Previn) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DECLARATION of Lawrence K. Iglesias OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL filed by Defendant Universal Recovery Corporation. (Iglesias, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for August 10, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 27, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Universal Recovery Corporation, identifying Universal Recovery Corporation and Elaine Gipson. (Iglesias, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Universal Recovery Corporation.(Attorney Lawrence K Iglesias added to party Universal Recovery Corporation(pty:dft))(Iglesias, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elaine Gipson, upon Defendant Universal Recovery Corporation served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wick, Previn) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Universal Recovery Corporation. (lh) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Donahue. (lh) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ELAINE GIPSON. (Wick, Previn) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ELAINE GIPSON, (Wick, Previn) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ELAINE GIPSON. (Wick, Previn) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26475526 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ELAINE GIPSON. (Attorney Previn A Wick added to party ELAINE GIPSON(pty:pla))(Wick, Previn) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Recovery, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence K. Iglesias

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Ewell Ellis