This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2019 at 16:12:09 (UTC).

El Paso County, Texas et al v. Trump et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 El Paso County, Texas filed an Other lawsuit against Trump. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Briones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00066

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Briones

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

El Paso County, Texas

Border Network for Human Rights

Defendants

David Bernhardt

Patrick M. Shanahan

Steven T Mnuchin

Kirstjen M. Nielsen

Donald J. Trump

John F. Bash

William Barr

Amicus Curiae

Ray Elliot Parker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Charles Padalino

Attorney at The Law Office of John Padalino

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 1540

Austin, TX 78701

Matthew Dollan

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019-6099

Laurence H. Tribe

Attorney at Law Office

1575 Massachusetts Avenue

Cambridge, MA 02138

David Bookbinder

Attorney at Niskanen Center

Justin Florence

Attorney at Protect Democracy Project, Inc.

2020 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw, #163

Washington, DC 20006

Erica Newland

Attorney at Protect Democracy Project, Inc.

2020 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw, #163

Washington, DC 20006

Richard Mancino

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019-6099

Kristy Parker

Attorney at Protect Democracy Project, Inc.

2020 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw, #163

Washington, DC 20006

Shaimaa Hussein

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019-6099

Deana K. El-Mallawany

Attorney at Protect Democracy Project, Inc.

10 Ware Street

Cambridge, MA 02138

Stuart M. Gerson

Attorney at Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.

1227 25Th Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20037

Samantha G. Prince

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019-6099

Stephanie Llanes

Attorney at Protect Democracy Project, Inc.

222 Broadway, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#44

(#44) ORDER GRANTING #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephanie Llanes for Border Network for Human Rights,Stephanie Llanes for El Paso County, Texas. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge David Briones. (lc3) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#43

(#43) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Hearing (lc3) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#42

(#42) Memorandum in Support of #41 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Ray Elbert Parker.(lc3) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

41 #1

Brief

#41

(#41) MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Ray Elbert Parker. (lc3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2019: #1 Brief) (lc3). (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#40

(#40) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. John F. Bash served on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Padalino, John) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#39

(#39) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. Donald J. Trump served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Padalino, John) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#38

(#38) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. Patrick M. Shanahan served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Padalino, John) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#33

(#44) ORDER GRANTING #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephanie Llanes for Border Network for Human Rights,Stephanie Llanes for El Paso County, Texas. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge David Briones. (lc3) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. AG (Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. Mnuchin (Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. Bernhardt (Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. Nielsen (Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. (Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. Trump (Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 #2

Corporate Disclosure

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Emergency Powers ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11788257), filed by El Paso County, Texas, Border Network for Human Rights. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure)(Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER GRANTING #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephanie Llanes for Border Network for Human Rights,Stephanie Llanes for El Paso County, Texas. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge David Briones. (lc3) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Hearing (lc3) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) Memorandum in Support of #41 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Ray Elbert Parker.(lc3) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Ray Elbert Parker. (lc3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2019: #1 Brief) (lc3). (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. John F. Bash served on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Padalino, John) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. Donald J. Trump served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Padalino, John) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. Patrick M. Shanahan served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Padalino, John) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. Kirstjen M. Nielsen served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Padalino, John) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. Steven T Mnuchin served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Padalino, John) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. David Bernhardt served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Padalino, John) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (mn) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge David Briones. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. US Atty (Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. AG (Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. Mnuchin (Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. Bernhardt (Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. Nielsen (Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. (Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Border Network for Human Rights, El Paso County, Texas. Trump (Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Emergency Powers ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11788257), filed by El Paso County, Texas, Border Network for Human Rights. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure)(Padalino, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where El Paso County, Texas is a litigant