This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2021 at 06:57:49 (UTC).

Eisenbach et al v. Village of Nelsonville et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Eisenbach filed an Other lawsuit against Village of Nelsonville. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth M. Karas and Vincent L. Briccetti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-08566

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kenneth M. Karas

Vincent L. Briccetti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joanne Eisenbach

Julien Davies

Catherine Polera

Rosemarie Orshakoski

George H. Eisenbach

Hope Rogers

David Eisenbach

Phil Weiss

Michael Orshakoski

Dana Carini

Kenneth Levine

Lauralee Holmbo

Cynthia King

Jennifer Young

Defendants

Village of Nelsonville

Village of Nelsonville Zoning Board of Appeals

NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP d/b/a/ VERIZON WIRELESS

William Bujarski

New Cingular Wireless PCD LLC d/b/a AT&T

Village of Nelsonville Planning Board

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Vincent Caruso

Attorney at Michael V. Caruso, P.C.

3871 Danbury Road, 10509

Brewster, NY 10509

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan Michael Bardavid

Attorney at Daniels, Porco and Lusardi, LLP

102 Gleneida Avenue

Carmel, NY 10512

Other Attorneys

Carlotta Cassidy-Young

Attorney at Snyder & Snyder, LLP

94 White Plains Road

Tarrytown, NY 10591

Robert Dominick Gaudioso

Attorney at Snyder & Snyder, LLP

94 White Plains Road

Tarrytown, NY 10591

Andrew Bradford Joseph

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

#59

(#59) ORDER denying #45 Motion for TRO. For the reasons stated on the record at a hearing today conducted by telephone conference and attended by counsel for all parties, plaintiffs' motion, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65, for a preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order is DENIED. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the motion. (Doc. #45). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 3/25/2021) (mml) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#41

No Description Available

#34

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#54

No Description Available

#53

No Description Available

#43

No Description Available

#37

No Description Available

21 #10

Exhibit 8 to Gaudioso Declaration

21 #6

Exhibit 4 to Gaudioso Declaration

21 #3

Exhibit 1 to Gaudioso Declaration

#19

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) DECLARATION of Robert D. Gaudioso in Support re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Homeland Towers, LLC, New Cingular Wireless PCD LLC, New York SMSA Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Candidates Article, #2 Exhibit 2, Election Article, #3 Exhibit 3, Memorandum Opinion and Order, #4 Exhibit 4, Consent Order, #5 Exhibit 5, Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6, Deed, #7 Exhibit 7, USFWS Letter).(Gaudioso, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Homeland Towers, LLC, New Cingular Wireless PCD LLC, New York SMSA Limited Partnership..(Gaudioso, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: show cause hearing held on 3/25/2021 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Angela O*Donnell, (914) 390-4025. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/10/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2021..(O'Donnell, Angela) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a show cause hearing proceeding held on 3/25/2021 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(O'Donnell, Angela) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Olshakoski, Rosemarie Olshakoski, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss, Jennifer Young..(Caruso, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) DECLARATION of Michael V. Caruso in Opposition re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Olshakoski, Rosemarie Olshakoski, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss, Jennifer Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Villella complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Rossi and Gillmer complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Ctr. Biological Diversity Order).(Caruso, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) DECLARATION of George Eisenbach in Opposition re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Olshakoski, Rosemarie Olshakoski, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss, Jennifer Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - May 30, 2018 joint meeting minutes, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - letter re. road and fire concerns).(Caruso, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) AFFIRMATION of David Eisenbach in Opposition re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Olshakoski, Rosemarie Olshakoski, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss, Jennifer Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - email to Village, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Highlands Current article 1.24.2020, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - H.Akselrad email to Village, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - E.Nagel email to Village, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - J.Biafore email to Village, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - March, 2020 drawings, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - HC article 4.10.2020, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - Bujarski rejection letter 3.26.2020, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - Homeland response letter 5.28.2020, #10 Exhibit Ex. J - Fire Dept Letter).(Caruso, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER denying #45 Motion for TRO. For the reasons stated on the record at a hearing today conducted by telephone conference and attended by counsel for all parties, plaintiffs' motion, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65, for a preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order is DENIED. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the motion. (Doc. #45). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 3/25/2021) (mml) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti: Show Cause Hearing held on 3/25/2021. (Court Reporter Angela O'Donnell) Order to follow.(dh) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Village of Nelsonville, Village of Nelsonville Zoning Board of Appeals, Village of Nelsonville Planning Board, William Bujarski, as Building Inspector of the Village of Nelsonville, Homeland Towers, LLC, New York SMSA Limited Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, and New Cingular Wireless PCD LLC d/b/a AT&T, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss, Jennifer Young..(Caruso, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Vincent Caruso to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Create one summons form and use a rider to list each party and their addresses;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ILLAGE OF NELSONVILLE, VILLAGE OF NELSONVILLE ZONING BOARD OF APPEALS, VILLAGE OF NELSONVILLE PLANNING BOARD, WILLIAM BUJARSKI, as Building Inspector of the Village of Nelsonville, HOMELAND TOWERS, LLC, NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP d/b/a VERIZON WIRELESS, NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCD LLC d/b/a AT&T, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss, Jennifer Young..(Caruso, Michael) Modified on 10/19/2020 (pc). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Caruso. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 893 (Environmental Matters);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 890 (Other Statutory Actions);. (gp) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Caruso. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York SMSA Limited Partnership. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was entered in all caps. Party text was omitted for William Bujarski. (gp) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Caruso, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against William Bujarski, Homeland Towers, LLC, NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP d/b/a/ VERIZON WIRELESS, New Cingular Wireless PCD LLC d/b/a AT&T, Village of Nelsonville, Village of Nelsonville Planning Board, Village of Nelsonville Zoning Board of Appeals. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22133512)Document filed by Kenneth Levine, Michael Orshakoski, Jo Mango, George H. Eisenbach, David Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Julien Davies, Cynthia King, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Joanne Eisenbach, Anne Champlin, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss, Jonathan D. Champlin, Jennifer Young, Raymond H. Champlin, Dana Carini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in DJ Action, #2 Exhibit Consent Order, #3 Tower Construction Drawings).(Caruso, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERIZON WIRELESS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlotta Cassidy-Young