This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2021 at 09:30:23 (UTC).

Eischen v. Community National Bank of Okarche

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Eischen filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Community National Bank of Okarche. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen P. Friot. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00643

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen P. Friot

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michell J Eischen

Defendant

Community National Bank of Okarche

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patricia A Podolec

Attorney at Patricia A Podolec Attorney at Law

10601 S Western, Suite 119

Oklahoma City, OK 73170

Defendant Attorney

Nathan L Whatley

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/7/2021 10:00 AM before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 9/1/2021. (llg) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Patricia A Podolec on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Podolec, Patricia) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) to Plaintiff's Petition by Community National Bank of Okarche.(Whatley, Nathan) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Community National Bank of Okarche . (Whatley, Nathan) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan L Whatley on behalf of Community National Bank of Okarche (Whatley, Nathan) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3709822. (Whatley, Nathan) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Kingfisher County, case number CJ-2021-00039 filed by Community National Bank of Okarche. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Petition, #2 Exhibit 2- Summons, #3 Exhibit 3- Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Community National Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan L Whatley