This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/10/2019 at 07:35:53 (UTC).

Einhorn v. AxoGen, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Einhorn filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against AxoGen, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth A. Kovachevich and Amanda Arnold Sansone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00069

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth A. Kovachevich

Referral Judge

Amanda Arnold Sansone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neil Einhorn

Defendants

AxoGen, Inc.

Leerink Partners LLC

Jamie M Grooms

John Harper

Amy Wendell

Peter J Mariani

William Blair & Company, L.L.C.

JMP Securities LLC

Guido Nells

Mark Gold

Joe Mandato

Gregory G Freitag

Jefferies LLC

Karen Zaderej

Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.

Robert J Rudelius

Jamie M. Grooms

Peter J. Mariani

Guido Neels

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Leo Wassner Desmond

Attorney at Desmond Law Firm

5070 Highway A1A Ste D

Vero Beach, FL 32963-1229

Lionel Z. Glancy

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray, LLP

1925 Century Park E Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Robert V. Prongay

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray, LLP

1925 Century Park E Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Charles H. Linehan

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray, LLP

1925 Century Park E Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Howard G. Smith

Attorney at Law Offices of Howard G. Smith

3070 Bristol Pike Ste 112

Bensalem, PA 19020

Lesley F. Portnoy

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray, LLP

1925 Century Park E Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Pavithra Rajesh

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray, LLP

1925 Century Park E Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Marc A. Silverman

Attorney at DLA Piper US, LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas 27Th Flr

New York, NY 10020-1104

Fredrick H. L. McClure

Attorney at DLA Piper US, LLP

3111 W. Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. Blvd. Suite 300

Tampa, FL 33607-6233

Caryn G. Schechtman

Attorney at DLA Piper US, LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas 27Th Flr

New York, NY 10020-1104

 

Court Documents

#25

#23

21 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#21

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Affidavit of Lesley F. Portnoy

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #7

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Marc Silverman, appearing on behalf of AxoGen, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055510.) Related document: #25 Unopposed MOTION for Marc Silverman to appear pro hac vice. (ARC) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Marc Silverman may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel comply with the email registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(d), M.D. Fla., within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 2/22/2019. (BEE) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Unopposed MOTION for Marc Silverman to appear pro hac vice by AxoGen, Inc. (McClure, Fredrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ENDORSED ORDER adopting briefing schedule as set forth in #23 the parties' joint notice. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel is to be filed and served on or before March 11, 2019, with responses due on or before March 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 2/18/2019. (RLH) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE by Neil Einhorn re 20 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Joint) (Desmond, Leo) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion to extend time. The parties shall meet for the purposes of preparing and filing a Case Management Report on or before the 60th day after the service of the consolidated amended complaint. The parties shall file their Case Management Report within fourteen days of the meeting. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 2/14/2019. (RLH) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Joint MOTION to extend time to Meet to Develop and File Case Management Report and Redesignating Action as Track Three Case by AxoGen, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClure, Fredrick) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 the Stipulated Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant AxoGen, Inc. shall not be required to file a response to #1 Plaintiff's complaint. Plaintiff shall file a consolidated amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the Court's appointment of a lead plaintiff and lead counsel. Defendant shall respond to the consolidated amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the filing of the amended consolidated complaint. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before 2/18/2019, the parties shall jointly file a proposed briefing schedule for selection of a lead plaintiff and lead counsel. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 2/4/2019. (RLH) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by AxoGen, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClure, Fredrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Charles H. Linehan may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel comply with the email registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(d), M.D. Fla., within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 2/4/2019. (BEE) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ***WITHDRAWN, PER COUNSEL; SEE #13 .***Unopposed MOTION for Charles E. Linehan to appear pro hac vice by Neil Einhorn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Desmond, Leo) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Modified text on 1/28/2019 (LNR). (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION for Lesley F. Portnoy to appear pro hac vice by Neil Einhorn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lesley F. Portnoy, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Portnoy, Lesley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION for Caryn G. Schechtman to appear pro hac vice by AxoGen, Inc. (McClure, Fredrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Fredrick H. L. McClure on behalf of AxoGen, Inc. (McClure, Fredrick) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 1/14/2019. (SRC) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS issued as to AxoGen, Inc., Gregory G Freitag, Mark Gold, Jamie M. Grooms, John Harper, JMP Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Joe Mandato, Peter J. Mariani, Guido Neels, Robert J. Rudelius, Amy Wendell, Karen Zaderej. (LNR) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/15/2008. (LNR) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (LNR) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-69-T-17AAS. (SJB) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15000422) filed by Neil Einhorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons, #14 Proposed Summons, #15 Proposed Summons)(Desmond, Leo) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AXOGEN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Leerink Partners LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where William Blair & Company L.L.C. is a litigant