This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2021 at 08:07:08 (UTC).

Eighty Ninth Center LLC v. Sentinel Insurance Company LTD

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 Eighty Ninth Center LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sentinel Insurance Company LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick R Wyrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00972

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick R Wyrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eighty Ninth Center LLC

Defendant

Sentinel Insurance Company LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ashley H Leavitt

Attorney at Koller Trial Law, PLLC

2504 E. 21St Street, Suite B

Tulsa, OK 74114-1759

A Laurie Koller

Attorney at Koller Trial Law

2504 E 21St St, Suite B

Tulsa, OK 74114-1759

Ben D Baker

Attorney at Red Dirt Legal, PLLC

201 North Broadway Street, Suite 111

Moore, OK 73160

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica L Dickerson

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-TULSA

Two West 2Nd St, Suite 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

Tyler E Ames

Attorney at McAfee Taft

2 West 2Nd Street, Ste 1117

Tulsa, OK 74103

Brandon L Buchanan

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley H Leavitt on behalf of Eighty Ninth Center LLC (Leavitt, Ashley) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the October 2022 trial docket (10/11/2022 09:30 AM) in Courtroom 503 before Judge Patrick R Wyrick; Motions to join due 30 days from date of this order; Motions to amend due 30 days from date of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 8/1/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 8/11/2022; Pla witness list due 8/1/2022; Dft witness list due 8/11/2022; Pla exhibit list due 8/1/2022; Dft exhibit list due 8/11/2022; Motions in limine due 9/22/2022; Jury instructions due 9/22/2022; Voir dire requests due 9/22/2022; Trial briefs due 9/22/2022; Discovery due by 9/1/2022. Motions due by 8/1/2022. Pretrial Report due by 9/22/2022. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 10/26/2021. (ks) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#13

(#13) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Eighty Ninth Center LLC. (Koller, A) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Counsel's Motion to Attend Status and Scheduling conference Telephonically. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 10/19/2021. (ks) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear for Hearing Telephonically by Eighty Ninth Center LLC. (Koller, A) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Sentinel Insurance Company LTD . (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by All Plaintiffs . (Baker, Ben) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#8

(#8) NOVEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2021 09:50 AM in Courtroom 503 before Judge Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 10/19/2021. (ks) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#7

(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Tyler E Ames on behalf of Sentinel Insurance Company LTD (Ames, Tyler) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Articles of Organization

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - OID Transmittal

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley H Leavitt on behalf of Eighty Ninth Center LLC (Leavitt, Ashley) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the October 2022 trial docket (10/11/2022 09:30 AM) in Courtroom 503 before Judge Patrick R Wyrick; Motions to join due 30 days from date of this order; Motions to amend due 30 days from date of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 8/1/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 8/11/2022; Pla witness list due 8/1/2022; Dft witness list due 8/11/2022; Pla exhibit list due 8/1/2022; Dft exhibit list due 8/11/2022; Motions in limine due 9/22/2022; Jury instructions due 9/22/2022; Voir dire requests due 9/22/2022; Trial briefs due 9/22/2022; Discovery due by 9/1/2022. Motions due by 8/1/2022. Pretrial Report due by 9/22/2022. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 10/26/2021. (ks) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Eighty Ninth Center LLC. (Koller, A) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Counsel's Motion to Attend Status and Scheduling conference Telephonically. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 10/19/2021. (ks) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear for Hearing Telephonically by Eighty Ninth Center LLC. (Koller, A) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Sentinel Insurance Company LTD . (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by All Plaintiffs . (Baker, Ben) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOVEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2021 09:50 AM in Courtroom 503 before Judge Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 10/19/2021. (ks) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Tyler E Ames on behalf of Sentinel Insurance Company LTD (Ames, Tyler) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by A Laurie Koller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Koller, A) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sentinel Insurance Company LTD.(Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon L Buchanan on behalf of Sentinel Insurance Company LTD (Buchanan, Brandon) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Ben D Baker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baker, Ben) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica L Dickerson on behalf of Sentinel Insurance Company LTD (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3771928. (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2021-3416 filed by Sentinel Insurance Company LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - OID Transmittal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Articles of Organization, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon L Buchanan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica L Dickerson