This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:37:13 (UTC).

Patricia Leslie Eguren v. Andrew Saul

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Patricia Leslie Eguren filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Andrew Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00140

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Leslie Eguren

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura E Krank

Attorney at Law Offices of Rohlfing and Kalagian LLP

211 East Ocean Boulevard Suite 420

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant Attorneys

Assistant US Attorney LA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Jean M Turk

Attorney at SAUSA - US Attorney's Office

160 Spear Street Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA

Attorney at Office of the General Counsel for Social Security Adm.

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (dv) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 2:20-cv-00140-ADS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) (Entered: 02/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Jean M Turk added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Turk, Jean) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Patricia Leslie Eguren. (Krank, Laura) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patricia Leslie Eguren, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 2/6/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Krank, Laura) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (dv) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Patricia Leslie Eguren, (Krank, Laura) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Patricia Leslie Eguren. (Krank, Laura) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Patricia Leslie Eguren. (Krank, Laura) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25067230 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Patricia Leslie Eguren. (Attorney Laura E Krank added to party Patricia Leslie Eguren(pty:pla))(Krank, Laura) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less