This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 07:48:44 (UTC).

Eggenschwiller v. Skechers U.S.A. Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Eggenschwiller filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Skechers U S A Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M Hoyt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04420

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M Hoyt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Constance Eggenschwiller

Houston, TX 77071

Defendants

Skecher USA Retail, LLC

Skechers U.S.A. Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Reiter Link

Attorney at Law Office of Scott Link

4400 Post Oak Parkway, Ste 2850

Houston, TX 77071

Defendant Attorney

Laura E. De Santos

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani

1900 West Loop South, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 281st Harris County District Court, case number 2019-69597 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23534017) filed by Skechers U.S.A. Inc., Skecher USA Retail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Index of State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 List of Attorneys)(De Santos, Laura) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Skecher USA Retail, LLC, Skechers U.S.A. Inc., filed.(De Santos, Laura) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 List of Attorneys

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 09:15 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 Index of State Court Documents

#4

(#4) First INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Constance Eggenschwiller, filed.(Link, Scott) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) First INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Constance Eggenschwiller, filed.(Link, Scott) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Skecher USA Retail, LLC, Skechers U.S.A. Inc., filed.(De Santos, Laura) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 09:15 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 281st Harris County District Court, case number 2019-69597 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23534017) filed by Skechers U.S.A. Inc., Skecher USA Retail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Index of State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 List of Attorneys)(De Santos, Laura) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less