This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:23:51 (UTC).

EFTEKHARZADEH v. BARR et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 EFTEKHARZADEH filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against BARR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudolph Contreras. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03635

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rudolph Contreras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAHAR EFTEKHARZADEH

Defendants

MIKE POMPEO

ELIZABETH KUHSE

CARL RISCH

KEVIN MCALEENAN

WILLIAM BARR

JOHN DOES #1-#10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer E. Nimer

Attorney at NIMER LAW LLC

3803 Attucks Drive, Suite A

Powell, OH 43065

Defendant Attorney

Marsha Wellknown Yee

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of All Defendants (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ELIZABETH KUHSE served on 12/12/2019; MIKE POMPEO served on 12/12/2019; CARL RISCH served on 12/12/2019 (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/12/19. (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN MCALEENAN served on 12/11/2019 (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/9/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/7/2020. (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM BARR, ELIZABETH KUHSE, KEVIN MCALEENAN, MIKE POMPEO, CARL RISCH and U.S. Attorney (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6620712) filed by SAHAR EFTEKHARZADEH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons AUSA, #11 Summons USAG, #12 Summons Acting Sec of DHS, #13 Summons Secretary of State, #14 Summons Assistant Sec for Consular Affairs, #15 Summons CG Embassy Yerevan)(Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.