This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 10:13:36 (UTC).

EFFREM v. ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 EFFREM filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David S. Cercone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00158

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David S. Cercone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIMOTHY ARTHUR EFFREM

Defendant

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emily E. Town

Attorney at Rothman Gordon

310 Grant Street, Third Floor, Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TIMOTHY ARTHUR EFFREM. ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, LLC waiver sent on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, LLC (ma) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6299361), filed by TIMOTHY ARTHUR EFFREM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TIMOTHY ARTHUR EFFREM. ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, LLC waiver sent on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, LLC (ma) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6299361), filed by TIMOTHY ARTHUR EFFREM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily E. Town Esq.