This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2022 at 10:12:46 (UTC).

Effinger et al v. Ancient Organics LLC

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Effinger filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Ancient Organics LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-03596

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kelly Effinger

Keefe Stevernu

Defendant

Ancient Organics LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Ryan Gustafson

Attorney at Good Gustafson Aumais LLP

2330 Westwood Blvd., Suite 103

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland - To be determined. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2022) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/20/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2022) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kelly Effinger, Keefe Stevernu.. (Gustafson, John) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kelly Effinger, Keefe Stevernu.. (Gustafson, John) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/20/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2022) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland - To be determined. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2022) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/5/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17276473.). Filed byKelly Effinger, Keefe Stevernu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gustafson, John) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Ryan Gustafson