This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2020 at 17:59:57 (UTC).

Edwards v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 Edwards filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are D. P. Marshall Jr. and Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00091

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

D. P. Marshall Jr.

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martha Edwards

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores Inc

Walmart Inc

Wal-Mart Stores East LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Derek Dewayne Hopson, Jr.

Attorney at Hopson Law Group

Post Office Box 266

Clarksdale, MS 38614

Defendant Attorneys

Britt Virden

Attorney at Virden Law Firm, PLLC

143 North Edison Street

Greenville, MS 38701

Brittany S. Ford

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Thomas G. Williams

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Michael Bailey Heister

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

 

Court Documents

#75

#74

#73

#72

#71

#70

#69

#68

#52

4 #4

Exhibit "4" Secretary of State Certificates

4 #3

Exhibit "3" Incident Report

4 #2

Exhibit "2" Summons

4 #1

Exhibit "1" Complaint

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #73 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Bailey Heister terminated. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 03/31/2020. (rmg) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) RESPONSE re #74 Scheduling Order, STATEMENT REGARDING NUMBER OF JURORS by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Williams, Thomas) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Discovery due by 9/24/2020; Motions due by 10/19/2020; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 1/19/2021; Status Report due by 10/19/2020. Signed at the direction of the Court on 03/31/2020. (rmg) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Defendants (Heister, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Williams, Thomas) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) ANSWER to #52 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Walmart Inc.(Williams, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) ORDER directing the parties to hold a Rule 26(f) conference within 14 days and to submit a report within 21 days. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/3/2020. (kdr) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martha Edwards. Wal-Mart Stores East LP served on 2/27/2020. (Hopson, Derek) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) NOTICE by Martha Edwards Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Hopson, Derek) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ORDER denying #66 Martha Edward's motion to amend her complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/26/2020. (kdr) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Party, Improper Venue, Insufficient Legal Process and Service of Legal Process. Responses due by 9/25/2018 (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/17/18. (bds) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Memorandum in Support, #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Party, Improper Venue, Insufficient Legal Process and Service of Legal Process by Martha Edwards. (Hopson, Derek) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden no longer assigned to the case. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Party, Improper Venue, Insufficient Legal Process and Service of Legal Process . (Virden, Robert) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Party, Improper Venue, Insufficient Legal Process and Service of Legal Process by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" Complaint, #2 Exhibit "2" Summons, #3 Exhibit "3" Incident Report, #4 Exhibit "4" Secretary of State Certificates) (Virden, Robert) Modified on 9/4/2018 (jla). [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.] (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.] (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M. Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1571166, filed by Martha Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 7/25/2019.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas G. Williams

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Britt Virden