This case was last updated from PACER on 01/21/2020 at 09:43:18 (UTC).

Edwards v. U.S Dist Court

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Edwards filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against U S Dist Court. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J. Schiltz and Leo I. Brisbois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-02984

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Johnathan Bernard Edwards

Moose Lake, MN 55767

Respondents

U.S Dist Court

William Bolin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Matthew Frank

Attorney at Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1800

445 Minnesota St Ste 1800

St Paul, MN 55101-2134

Peter R Marker

Attorney at Ramsey County Attorney's Office

345 Wabasha Street N., Suite 120

St Paul, MN 55102-1657

Edwin William Stockmeyer, III

Attorney at Office of the Minnesota Attorney General

Bremer Tower, Suite 1800, 445 Minnesota Street

St. Paul, MN 55101-2134

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER - 1. Respondent is directed to file an answer to the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Petitioner Johnathan Bernard Edwards, showing cause why the writ should not be granted. 2. Respondent's answer must fully comply with the requirements of Rules 5(b), (c) and (d) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts and must include a reasoned memorandum of law and fact fully stating Respondent's legal position on Edwards' claims. The answer must be filed with the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, and a copy of the answer must be served upon Edwards simultaneously with such filing. 3. If Edwards intends to file a reply to the answer, he must do so within thirty (30) days of the date when Respondents answer is filed. Thereafter, no further submissions from either party will be permitted, except as expressly authorized by Court Order. 4. Edwards' Motion to Vacate Sentence, #3 , is DENIED without prejudice as duplicative of the habeas corpus petition itself. 5. The Clerk of Court's office is directed to substitute William Bolin as Respondent in the present action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/30/2019. (JLB) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

6 #1

Affidavit of Service

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter R Marker on behalf of U.S Dist Court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Marker, Peter) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

5 #1

Cover Letter Attorney Substitution

#5

(#5) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by U.S Dist Court Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION VACATE SENTENCE OR IN ALETNATIVE REVERSE AND REMAND SO THAT PETITIONER COULD RECEIVE A FIAR TRIAL, OR CORRECT PETITIONERS SENTENCE filed by Johnathan Bernard Edwards.(JGK) Document QC'd on 12/18/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION VACATE SENTENCE OR IN ALETNATIVE REVERSE AND REMAND SO THAT PETITIONER COULD RECEIVE A FAIR TRIAL, OR CORRECT PETITIONERS SENTENCE. filed by Johnathan Bernard Edwards. (JGK) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) SUPPLEMENTAL PRO SE BRIEF filed by Johnathan Bernard Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JGK) Document QC'd on 12/18/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

1 #6

Envelope

1 #4

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Ntc Appeal

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER - 1. Respondent is directed to file an answer to the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Petitioner Johnathan Bernard Edwards, showing cause why the writ should not be granted. 2. Respondent's answer must fully comply with the requirements of Rules 5(b), (c) and (d) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts and must include a reasoned memorandum of law and fact fully stating Respondent's legal position on Edwards' claims. The answer must be filed with the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, and a copy of the answer must be served upon Edwards simultaneously with such filing. 3. If Edwards intends to file a reply to the answer, he must do so within thirty (30) days of the date when Respondents answer is filed. Thereafter, no further submissions from either party will be permitted, except as expressly authorized by Court Order. 4. Edwards' Motion to Vacate Sentence, #3 , is DENIED without prejudice as duplicative of the habeas corpus petition itself. 5. The Clerk of Court's office is directed to substitute William Bolin as Respondent in the present action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/30/2019. (JLB) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter R Marker on behalf of U.S Dist Court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Marker, Peter) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by U.S Dist Court Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION VACATE SENTENCE OR IN ALETNATIVE REVERSE AND REMAND SO THAT PETITIONER COULD RECEIVE A FIAR TRIAL, OR CORRECT PETITIONERS SENTENCE filed by Johnathan Bernard Edwards.(JGK) Document QC'd on 12/18/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION VACATE SENTENCE OR IN ALETNATIVE REVERSE AND REMAND SO THAT PETITIONER COULD RECEIVE A FAIR TRIAL, OR CORRECT PETITIONERS SENTENCE. filed by Johnathan Bernard Edwards. (JGK) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUPPLEMENTAL PRO SE BRIEF filed by Johnathan Bernard Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JGK) Document QC'd on 12/18/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 4-105472) filed by Johnathan Bernard Edwards. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ntc Appeal, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 12/18/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less