This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2020 at 09:45:53 (UTC).

Edwards v. Hudspeth & Associates, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Edwards filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Hudspeth Associates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02867

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Edwards

Defendant

Hudspeth & Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

April Rheaume

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Joshua J. Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Defendant Attorney

Patrick F. Hulla

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC-Kansas City

4520 Main Street, Suite 400

Kansas City, MO 64111

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Certain Deadlines by Defendant Hudspeth & Associates, Inc.. (Hulla, Patrick) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#7

(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Anthony Edwards All parties consent.. (Rheaume, April) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#6

(#6) Stipulation of 21-Day Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Hudspeth & Associates, Inc.. (Hulla, Patrick) Modified on 10/20/2020 to correct event (jgonz, ). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Edwards. Hudspeth & Associates, Inc. served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 22 September 2020. Consent Form due by 11/19/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/26/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

1 #3

Summons Summons - Hudspeth & Associates, Inc.

1 #2

Exhibit Consent to Join -- Anthony Edwards

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Hudspeth & Associates, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7499861)Attorney Joshua J. Sanford added to party Anthony Edwards(pty:pla), filed by Anthony Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Consent to Join -- Anthony Edwards, #3 Summons Summons - Hudspeth & Associates, Inc.)(Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #7 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/12/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension. Defendant's deadline to respond to Complaint and file corporate disclosures is extended to 12/10/2020. The Parties' deadline to hold a Rule 26(f) conference is extended to 12/24/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/12/2021. The Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 9:30 AM is VACATED and RESET for 1/19/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall participate in the conference by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/12/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Certain Deadlines by Defendant Hudspeth & Associates, Inc.. (Hulla, Patrick) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Anthony Edwards All parties consent.. (Rheaume, April) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Stipulation of 21-Day Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Hudspeth & Associates, Inc.. (Hulla, Patrick) Modified on 10/20/2020 to correct event (jgonz, ). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Edwards. Hudspeth & Associates, Inc. served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 22 September 2020. Consent Form due by 11/19/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/26/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hudspeth & Associates, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7499861)Attorney Joshua J. Sanford added to party Anthony Edwards(pty:pla), filed by Anthony Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Consent to Join -- Anthony Edwards, #3 Summons Summons - Hudspeth & Associates, Inc.)(Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less