This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2019 at 07:06:30 (UTC).

Edwards v. Amazon.com.dedc, Inc

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 Edwards filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Amazon com dedc, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03990

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Craig Edwards

Defendant

Amazon.com.dedc, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David B. Levin

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.

333 Skokie Blvd., Suite 103

Northbrook, IL 60062

Steven Gene Perry

Attorney at Law Offices Of Todd M. Friedman, P.c.

333 Skokie Blvd., Suite 103

Northbrook, IL 60062

Todd M Friedman

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman

21550 Oxnard St., Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Craig Edwards by David B. Levin (Levin, David) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Craig Edwards; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15929419. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levin, David) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Perry, Steven) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Craig Edwards. Amazon.com.dedc, Inc waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Levin, David) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Craig Edwards by Steven Gene Perry (Perry, Steven) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Craig Edwards by Todd M Friedman (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Levin, David) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The initial status hearing set for 8/20/19 is reset to 9/10/19 at 9:00 a.m.The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 8/20/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The initial status hearing set for 8/20/19 is reset to 9/10/19 at 9:00 a.m.The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Craig Edwards. Amazon.com.dedc, Inc waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Levin, David) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Perry, Steven) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Levin, David) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 8/20/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Craig Edwards by Todd M Friedman (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Amazon.com.dedc, Inc (daj, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Craig Edwards by Steven Gene Perry (Perry, Steven) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Craig Edwards by David B. Levin (Levin, David) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Craig Edwards; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15929419. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levin, David) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less