This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 13:52:50 (UTC).

Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P. v. Riggan

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 Edward D Jones Co , L P filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Riggan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Wesley Hendrix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00119

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Wesley Hendrix

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P.

Edward D Jones & Co LP

Defendants

Russell Ryon Riggan

Rhettkyn LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fernando M Bustos

Attorney at Bustos Law Firm PC

Po Box 1980

Lubbock, TX 79408-1980

Carolyn Diane Roch

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner LLC

1201 Louisiana Street, Suite 3375

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua Benjamin Baker

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale PC

1901 6Th Avenue North, Suite 1700

Birmingham, AL 35203

Peter Sean Fruin

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale PC

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 1700

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) ORDER: Before the Court is the Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P.'s Agreed Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Deadline to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Dkt. No. #35 . The Court grants the motion. It is ordered that Edward Jones must file its response to Rhettkyn, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. #32 ) by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, July 30, 2021. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 7/16/2021) (krr) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

35 #1

Proposed Order

#35

(#35) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively, Motion for Court to Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction filed by Edward D Jones & Co LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roch, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

34 #1

Exhibit(s)

#34

(#34) REPLY filed by Edward D Jones & Co LP re: #31 MOTION for Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Roch, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

32 #1

Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

#32

(#32) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively, Motion for Court to Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction filed by Rhettkyn LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)Attorney Peter Sean Fruin added to party Rhettkyn LLC(pty:dft) (Fruin, Peter) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

31 #1

Exhibit(s)

#31

(#31) MOTION for Injunction filed by Edward D Jones & Co LP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Roch, Carolyn) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

6 #3

Proposed Order

6 #2

Exhibit(s)

6 #1

Exhibit(s)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carolyn Diane Roch on behalf of Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Roch, Carolyn) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P. re #1 Complaint,,,, (Roch, Carolyn) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER SETTING HEARING: Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2021 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom C-216, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, TX 79401-4091 before Judge James Wesley Hendrix. re: #1 Complaint and Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 5/21/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P.. (Bustos, Fernando) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #6 Motion for TRO, #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P.. (Bustos, Fernando) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER: Before the Court is the Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P.'s Agreed Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Deadline to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Dkt. No. #35 . The Court grants the motion. It is ordered that Edward Jones must file its response to Rhettkyn, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. #32 ) by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, July 30, 2021. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 7/16/2021) (krr) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively, Motion for Court to Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction filed by Edward D Jones & Co LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roch, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) REPLY filed by Edward D Jones & Co LP re: #31 MOTION for Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Roch, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) OBJECTION filed by Rhettkyn LLC re: #31 MOTION for Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Fruin, Peter) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively, Motion for Court to Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction filed by Rhettkyn LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)Attorney Peter Sean Fruin added to party Rhettkyn LLC(pty:dft) (Fruin, Peter) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION for Injunction filed by Edward D Jones & Co LP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Roch, Carolyn) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER: The Court orders Edward Jones to file an independent motion establishing its basis for its requested injunctive relief by June 22, 2021. Rhettkyn, LLC is ordered to file a response to the forthcoming motion no later than July 6, 2021. Finally, the Court orders that Edward Jones's reply is due within seven days of Rhettkyn, LLC's response. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 6/15/2021) (krr) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rhettkyn LLC filed by Edward D Jones & Co LP. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Roch, Carolyn) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER: The preliminary-injunction hearing scheduled for Monday, June 7, 2021 is cancelled. The parties indicate that their agreement does not impact Edward Jones's claims against Rhettkyn, LLC or Plaintiff's Application for Second Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Dkt. No. #19 . The Court notes that upon the resolution of Edward Jones's claims against Riggan, the only remaining claims before the Court are state law claims against Rhettkyn-which are well below the statutory threshold of $75,000. Therefore, Edward Jones is ordered to show that the Court has subject-matter jurisdiction over these claims no later than June 11, 2021. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 6/3/2021) (krr) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STATUS REPORT filed by Edward D Jones & Co LP. (Roch, Carolyn) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT re #9 Response/Objection by Russell Ryon Riggan. (Fruin, Peter) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) OBJECTION filed by Russell Ryon Riggan re: #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Fruin, Peter) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #6 Motion for TRO, #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P.. (Bustos, Fernando) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Wesley Hendrix: Motion Hearing held on 5/24/2021 re #6 Motion for TRO filed by Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P.. re: #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Court heard argument from both parties. Supplemental filings due by 12:20 p.m. today, 5/24/21. Ruling by the Court to be entered by 5:00 p.m. this date. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Fernando Bustos/Carolyn Roch; Defense - Joshua Baker. (Court Reporter: Mechelle Daniel) (Exhibits admitted (Plf's 1-3 and Deft's 1 - Originals in custody of the party) Time in Court - 1:08. (chmb) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Proposed Order) (Roch, Carolyn) (Entered: 05/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carolyn Diane Roch on behalf of Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Roch, Carolyn) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P. re #1 Complaint,,,, (Roch, Carolyn) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER SETTING HEARING: Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2021 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom C-216, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, TX 79401-4091 before Judge James Wesley Hendrix. re: #1 Complaint and Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 5/21/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P.. (Bustos, Fernando) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Russell Ryon Riggan filed by Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11917424) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Bustos, Fernando) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Edward D. Jones, Co. L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carolyn Roch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fernando M Bustos