This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 14:04:38 (UTC).

EDUCATIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION v. CAROLINA AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 EDUCATIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Student Loan Collection lawsuit against CAROLINA AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are N. C. TILLEY, JR and L. PATRICK AULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00537

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Student Loan Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. C. TILLEY, JR

Referral Judge

L. PATRICK AULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDUCATIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

Defendants

CAROLINA AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC

CAROLINA AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC doing business as CAROLINA KIA OF HIGH POINT AND CAROLINA HYUNDAI OF HIGH POINT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LISA P. SUMNER

Attorney at NEXSEN PRUET, PLLC

301 Fayetteville Street, Ste. 1900

Raleigh, NC 27602

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE by EDUCATIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION re #1 Complaint,, #4 Affidavit of Service of Consent to Extension (SUMNER, LISA) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to CAROLINA AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (SUMNER, LISA) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

3 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#3

(#3) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to CAROLINA AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit Summons

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E - 3/26/2019 Fourth Demand for Compliance

1 #4

Exhibit D - 1/7/2019 Notice of Employer Non-Compliance to Carolina Kia Hyundai

1 #3

Exhibit C - 10/5/2018 Second Notice Order of Withholding from Earnings

1 #2

Exhibit B - 8/21/2018 Order of Withholding

1 #1

Exhibit A - 07/17/2018 Notice Prior to Wage Withholding

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Carolina Automotive Group LLC d/b/a Carolina Kia of High Point and Carolina Hyundai of High Point ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2575468.), filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 07/17/2018 Notice Prior to Wage Withholding, #2 Exhibit B - 8/21/2018 Order of Withholding, #3 Exhibit C - 10/5/2018 Second Notice Order of Withholding from Earnings, #4 Exhibit D - 1/7/2019 Notice of Employer Non-Compliance to Carolina Kia Hyundai, #5 Exhibit E - 3/26/2019 Fourth Demand for Compliance, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit Summons)(SUMNER, LISA) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by EDUCATIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION re #1 Complaint,, #4 Affidavit of Service of Consent to Extension (SUMNER, LISA) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to CAROLINA AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (SUMNER, LISA) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to CAROLINA AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Case assigned to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Carolina Automotive Group LLC d/b/a Carolina Kia of High Point and Carolina Hyundai of High Point ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2575468.), filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 07/17/2018 Notice Prior to Wage Withholding, #2 Exhibit B - 8/21/2018 Order of Withholding, #3 Exhibit C - 10/5/2018 Second Notice Order of Withholding from Earnings, #4 Exhibit D - 1/7/2019 Notice of Employer Non-Compliance to Carolina Kia Hyundai, #5 Exhibit E - 3/26/2019 Fourth Demand for Compliance, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit Summons)(SUMNER, LISA) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less