This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2023 at 09:57:14 (UTC).

Eduardo Sapetto v. Tate and Kirlin Associates, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Eduardo Sapetto filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Tate and Kirlin Associates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00245

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sherilyn Peace Garnett

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eduardo Sapetto

Defendant

Tate and Kirlin Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gustavo Ponce

Prescott Littlefield

Andrew James Kearney

David J McGlothlin

Mona Amini

Seyed Abbas Kazerounian

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34614022 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Sapetto. (Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Eduardo Sapetto(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Sapetto. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Sapetto, identifying Defendant Tate & Kirlin Associates, Inc.. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Sapetto. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tate and Kirlin Associates, Inc. (car) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eduardo Sapetto, upon Defendant Tate and Kirlin Associates, Inc. served on 2/16/2022, answer due 3/9/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process, Corporate Service Company, Nicole Stauss, Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Amini, Mona) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eduardo Sapetto, upon Defendant Tate and Kirlin Associates, Inc. served on 2/16/2022, answer due 3/9/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process, Corporate Service Company, Nicole Stauss, Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Amini, Mona) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tate and Kirlin Associates, Inc. (car) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Sapetto. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Sapetto, identifying Defendant Tate & Kirlin Associates, Inc.. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Sapetto. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34614022 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Sapetto. (Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Eduardo Sapetto(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less