This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2023 at 09:33:36 (UTC).

Edmonston v. Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 Edmonston filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher C. Conner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01794

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher C. Conner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy Edmonston

Defendant

Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jake Daniel Novelli

Attorney at Murphy Law Group, LLC

1628 John F Kennedy Blvd, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael P Murphy

Attorney at Murphy Law Group, LLC

1628 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 1803

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Summons Packet

#3

(#3) ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/10/2022. (mw) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Transfer Case by Amy Edmonston. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Novelli, Jake) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

4 #1

Memo

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #3

Certificate of Service

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/16/2022 (mw) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Middle has been opened in Eastern District of Pennsylvania as case 5:22-cv-04574, filed 11/16/2022. (jw) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (mw) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/16/2022 (mw) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the Brief in Support of Doc. 4 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)- Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) (pjr) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Transfer Case by Amy Edmonston. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Novelli, Jake) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/10/2022. (mw) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-6113695), filed by Amy Edmonston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAIRWAY INDEPENDENT MORTGAGE CORPORATION A TEXAS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.