This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2020 at 08:23:02 (UTC).

Edmonson v. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 Edmonson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane K. Vescovo and Mark S. Norris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02102

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

Presiding Judge

Mark S. Norris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Retia Nicole Edmonson

Defendant

Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Clerk Temiika Gipson

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herman Morris

Attorney at The Morris Law Firm

119 S. Main Street, Suite 500

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

Ronna D. Kinsella

Attorney at GLASSMAN EDWARDS WYATT TUTTLE & COX, P.C.

26 N. Second Street

Memphis, TN 38103

Robert A. Cox

Attorney at GLASSMAN EDWARDS WADE & WYATT, P.C.

26 N. Second Street Building

Memphis, TN 38103-2602

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 06/05/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc..(Cox, Robert) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#4

(#4) Judge Mark S. Norris and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronna D. Kinsella on behalf of Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. (Kinsella, Ronna) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Cox on behalf of Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. (Cox, Robert) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit, case number CT-5564-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3280777), filed by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cox, Robert) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 06/05/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc..(Cox, Robert) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Judge Mark S. Norris and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronna D. Kinsella on behalf of Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. (Kinsella, Ronna) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Cox on behalf of Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. (Cox, Robert) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit, case number CT-5564-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3280777), filed by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cox, Robert) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less