This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 06:29:59 (UTC).

Edmonds v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 Edmonds filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas P. Barber, Sean P. Flynn and Charlene Edwards Honeywell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00825

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

Presiding Judges

Thomas P. Barber

Charlene Edwards Honeywell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARNOLD EDMONDS

Defendants

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

ALFA LAVAL INC.

THE DELAVAL SEPARATOR COMPANY

SHARPLES CORP.

CRANE CO.

DEMING PUMP CO.,

COCHRANE CORPORATION

CHAPMAN VALVE CO.

SWARTWOUT CO.

ELLIOT COMPANY, a/k/a ELLIOT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC.

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

JOHN CRANE, INC., f/k/a CRANE PACKING

PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC., f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM, INC.,

CBS CORP., f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

BF STURTEVANT CO.

VELAN VALVE CORP.

WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc;

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paige Wojdyla

Attorney at Vinson Law PA

5505 W Gray St, Tampa

Tampa, FL 33609

Mark A. Alonzo

Attorney at Vinson Law PL

5505 W Gray St

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorneys

Amanda Rae Cachaldora

Attorney at Bice Cole Law Firm, PL

Suite 710, 999 Ponce De Leon Blvd

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Melanie E. Chung-Tims

Attorney at Bice Cole Law Firm, PL

Suite 710, 999 Ponce De Leon Blvd

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Chris Nick Kolos

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP - Orlando

200 S Orange Ave - Ste 2600

Orlando, FL 32801

Ryan Martin Kocse

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

200 S Orange Ave, Suite 2600

Orlando, FL 32801

Christopher J. M. Collings

Attorney at Collings Law Firm

255 Alhambra Circle, Suite 800

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Erin Dardis

701 Brickell Avenue., 17Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131-1806

Erin E. Dardis

Attorney at Collings Law Firm

255 Alhambra Circle, Suite 800

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Other Attorneys

Caitlyn R. McCutcheon

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33131-2339

Edward J. Briscoe

Attorney at Fowler White Burnett, PA

801 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1950

Miami, FL 33131-3353

Peter J. Melaragno

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

801 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1950

Miami, FL 33131-3353

Todd Carlton Alley

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young LLP

4000 Suntrust Plaza, 303 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

Charles Edward Reynolds, II

Attorney at Tyson and Mendes LLP

101 Ne 3Rd Ave., Suite 1500

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Timothy J. Ferguson

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Suite 1000, 4770 Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33137

John Charles Reddin

Attorney at Luks Santaniello Petrillo & Cohen

150 West Flagler Street, Suite 2600

Miami, FL 33130

Eduardo J. Medina

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Suite 1000, 4770 Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33137

Steven D. Lehner

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 500

Tampa, FL 33602-5301

Scott Parker Yount

Attorney at Garrison, Yount, Forte, & Mulcahy, LLC

Suite 800, 601 N Bayshore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33606-2760

Madeline St. Claire Villani

Attorney at Garrison, Yount, Forte, & Mulcahy, LLC

Suite 800, 601 N Bayshore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33606-2760

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#130

(#130) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Horn, Hanson) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#128

(#128) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Alexis Thomas on behalf of Arnold Edmonds. Lead Counsel: Alexis Thomas. (Thomas, Alexis) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#127

(#127) MOTION for Paige Wojdyla to Withdraw as Attorney by Arnold Edmonds. (Wojdyla, Paige) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#126

(#126) NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Weaver on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Weaver, Holly) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

125 #1

Exhibit

125 #125

Main Document

121 #5

Plaintiff's Responses to Interrogatories

121 #2

Plaintiffs' Second Complaint

121 #121

Main Document

1 #11

Exhibit Exhibit E to Notice of Removal

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit D to Notice of Removal

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit A-1 to Notice of Removal

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

State Court Other Documents

1 #3

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #2

State Court ANSWER

#1

(#2) NOTICE by PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC., f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM, INC., re #1 Notice of Removal of Joinder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Collings, Christopher) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

129 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #130 Joint Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel, which the Court construes as a motion to substitute attorney. The motion does not comply with Local Rule 2.02(c), which requires a certification of notice to the client and also requires "[t]he withdrawing lawyer -- not the lawyer's present or former or another firm" to file the motion. The movant is advised that individual attorneys, not a law firm, represent clients. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/12/2022. (ACS) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Horn, Hanson) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) ENDORSED ORDER granting #127 Plaintiff's Motion for Paige Wojdyla to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paige Wojdyla is terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff and relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Attorneys Alexis Thomas and Mark Alonzo will remain Plaintiff's counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 7/12/2022. (ACS) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Alexis Thomas on behalf of Arnold Edmonds. Lead Counsel: Alexis Thomas. (Thomas, Alexis) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) MOTION for Paige Wojdyla to Withdraw as Attorney by Arnold Edmonds. (Wojdyla, Paige) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Weaver on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Weaver, Holly) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) RESPONSE to Motion re #121 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion) to Enlarge Time to Take Plaintiff, Arnold Edmonds' Deposition and Request for Additional Relief and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Arnold Edmonds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wojdyla, Paige) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis Thomas on behalf of Arnold Edmonds (Thomas, Alexis) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an expedited response by Wednesday, June 29, 2022 to #121 Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to Take Plaintiff Arnold Edmonds' Deposition and Request for Additional Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/24/2022. (DK) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/3/2023, Dispositive motions due by 8/4/2023, Pretrial statement due by 11/14/2023, All other motions due by 11/14/2023, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2023 at 1:15 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 1/2/2024 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/8/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/23/2022. (BGS) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Martin Kocse on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (Kocse, Ryan) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Nick Kolos on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (Kolos, Chris) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of Paramount Global. Lead Counsel: Christopher J.M. Collings. (Collings, Christopher) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of General Electric Company. Lead Counsel: Christopher J.M. Collings. (Collings, Christopher) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation Notice of Appearance Of Lead Counsel and Designation of Email Address (Collings, Christopher) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation of Joinder in General Electric Company's Notice of Removal (Collings, Christopher) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:22-cv-0825-TPB-SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC., f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM, INC., re #1 Notice of Removal of Joinder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Collings, Christopher) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County, case number 22-CA-001513 filed in State Court on 2/22/22. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19432243 filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit A , #7 Exhibit A-1 , #8 Exhibit B , #9 Exhibit C , #10 Exhibit D , #11 Exhibit E (Collings, Christopher) Modified on 4/7/2022 (LD). (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC., f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM, INC., is a litigant