This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/06/2021 at 08:08:10 (UTC).

Edmond Regional Eye Assoicates Inc v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Edmond Regional Eye Assoicates Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott L. Palk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00876

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott L. Palk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edmond Regional Eye Assoicates Inc

Defendant

Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew B Wade

Attorney at Abel Law Firm

900 Ne 63Rd St

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica L Dickerson

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-TULSA

Two West 2Nd St, Suite 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

William J Holland

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-TULSA

Two West 2Nd St, Suite 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

Brandon L Buchanan

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 11/21/2021; Motions to amend due 11/21/2021; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 6/1/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 6/15/2022; Pla witness list due 6/1/2022; Dft witness list due 6/15/2022; Pla exhibit list due 6/20/2022; Dft exhibit list due 6/27/2022; Stipulations due 8/1/2022; Motions in limine due 8/1/2022; Jury instructions due 8/1/2022; Voir dire requests due 8/1/2022; Trial briefs due 8/1/2022; Discovery due by 8/1/2022. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom 304 before Judge Scott L. Palk. Motions due by 7/1/2022. Pretrial Report due by 8/1/2022. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 10/22/2021. (md) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#10

(#10) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Edmond Regional Eye Assoicates Inc. (Wade, Matthew) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#9

(#9) TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2021 11:00 AM in before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 10/21/2021. (md) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.(Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company . (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - SOS Entity Summary

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - OID

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Docket

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 11/21/2021; Motions to amend due 11/21/2021; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 6/1/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 6/15/2022; Pla witness list due 6/1/2022; Dft witness list due 6/15/2022; Pla exhibit list due 6/20/2022; Dft exhibit list due 6/27/2022; Stipulations due 8/1/2022; Motions in limine due 8/1/2022; Jury instructions due 8/1/2022; Voir dire requests due 8/1/2022; Trial briefs due 8/1/2022; Discovery due by 8/1/2022. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom 304 before Judge Scott L. Palk. Motions due by 7/1/2022. Pretrial Report due by 8/1/2022. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 10/22/2021. (md) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Edmond Regional Eye Assoicates Inc. (Wade, Matthew) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2021 11:00 AM in before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 10/21/2021. (md) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.(Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company . (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon L Buchanan on behalf of Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (Buchanan, Brandon) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by William J Holland on behalf of Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (Holland, William) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica L Dickerson on behalf of Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3755498. (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Edmond Regional Eye Assoicates Inc. (Wade, Matthew) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew B Wade on behalf of Edmond Regional Eye Assoicates Inc (Wade, Matthew) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2021-3286 filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - OID, #5 Exhibit 5 - SOS Entity Summary, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN INSURER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William J. Holland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon L Buchanan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica L Dickerson