This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/11/2020 at 10:49:33 (UTC).

Edge's Transfer, LLC et al v. CRST International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 Edge's Transfer, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CRST International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00537

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mitchell Edge

Edge's Transfer, LLC

Defendants

Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company

CRST International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Ray Graff

Attorney at Mayer, Graff & Wallace, LLP

1425 Memorial Drive

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Defendant Attorney

Ward I. Richter

Attorney at Bell, Moore & Richter, S.C.

345 West Washington Avenue, Suite 302

Madison, WI 53703-3007

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Richter, Ward) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

4 #2

Exhibit Ex. A to Insurance Policy Part 1

4 #1

Exhibit Ex. A to Insurance Policy Part 1

#4

(#4) ANSWER by Defendant Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Insurance Policy Part 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Insurance Policy Part 1) (Richter, Ward) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Ward I. Richter for Defendant Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Richter, Ward) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Mitchell Edge, Edge's Transfer, LLC. (Graff, Ryan) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2695851.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Graff, Ryan) Modified on 6/12/2020: E-mail sent to counsel. (lak) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Richter, Ward) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER by Defendant Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Insurance Policy Part 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Insurance Policy Part 1) (Richter, Ward) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Ward I. Richter for Defendant Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Richter, Ward) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Mitchell Edge, Edge's Transfer, LLC. (Graff, Ryan) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2695851.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Graff, Ryan) Modified on 6/12/2020: E-mail sent to counsel. (lak) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRST INTERNATIONAL INC. AN IOWA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan R Graff