This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:37:47 (UTC).

Edgecomb v. RHI Magnesita et al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 Edgecomb filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RHI Magnesita. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00219

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin Edgecomb

Defendants, Cross Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

IPEC, Inc.

RHI Magnesita

Defendant, Cross Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

RHI Magnesita

Defendant and Cross Defendant

IPEC, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Facilitative Mediator

3Rd Party Defendant

J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stuart M. Feldheim

Attorney at Feldheim & Wilenkin, P.C.

30300 Northwestern Hwy., Ste. 108

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

Defendant, Cross Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth Stephen Dombrowski

Attorney at Kallas & Henk PC

43902 Woodward Ave., Ste. 200

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48302-5022

Charles H. Worsfold

Attorney at Bosch Killman VanderWal PC

2900 E. Beltline Ave. N.E., Ste A

Grand Rapids, MI 49525

Tara Gill Nalencz

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson, LLP

The Widener Building, 1339 Chestnut St., 16Th Fl.

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Kimberly A. House

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson, LLP

The Widener Building, 1339 Chestnut St., 16Th Fl.

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Defendant, Cross Claimant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Charles H. Worsfold

Attorney at Bosch Killman VanderWal PC

2900 E. Beltline Ave. N.E., Ste A

Grand Rapids, MI 49525

Tara Gill Nalencz

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson, LLP

The Widener Building, 1339 Chestnut St., 16Th Fl.

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Kimberly A. House

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson, LLP

The Widener Building, 1339 Chestnut St., 16Th Fl.

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Kenneth Stephen Dombrowski

Attorney at Kallas & Henk PC

43902 Woodward Ave., Ste. 200

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48302-5022

Not Classified By Court Attorney

William W. Jack, Jr.

Attorney at Smith Haughey Rice & Roegge PC (Grand Rapids)

100 Monroe Center, Nw

Grand Rapids, MI 49503-2802

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) RESPONSE TO MOTION for leave to file a First Amended Complaint #26 filed by RHI Magnesita (Nalencz, Tara) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#33

(#33) RESPONSE TO MOTION for leave to file a First Amended Complaint #26 filed by IPEC, Inc. (Dombrowski, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#32

(#32) SUMMONS ISSUED as to third-party defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. (mg) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#31

(#31) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file a First Amended Complaint #26 filed by Kevin Edgecomb (Feldheim, Stuart) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#30

(#30) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file a First Amended Complaint #26 filed by Kevin Edgecomb (Feldheim, Stuart) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#29

(#29) ORDER regarding Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint #26 and certificate of concurrence; motion held in abeyance pending filing of certificate; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#28

(#28) PROPOSED SUMMONS for third party J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. filed by RHI Magnesita (Worsfold, Charles) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (mg). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#27

(#27) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. RHI Magnesita filed by RHI Magnesita (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Worsfold, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

26 #1

Attachment First Amended Complaint Adding St. Marys Cement U.S. LLC as a New Par

#26

(#26) MOTION for leave to file a First Amended Complaint by plaintiff Kevin Edgecomb; (Attachments: #1 Attachment First Amended Complaint Adding St. Marys Cement U.S. LLC as a New Party Defendant Pursuant to FRCP Rule 15) (Feldheim, Stuart) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#7

Copy of Order #6 , Mandatory E-Filing Letter #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Stuart M. Feldheim (mg) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#6

Copy of Order #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Charlevoix Circuit Court (mg) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) CORRECTED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlevoix Circuit Court case number 19-0658-26 filed by RHI Magnesita (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint and Jury Demand) (Worsfold, Charles) Modified text on 3/25/2019; this entry replaces #1 and #4 (mg). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#4

(#5) CORRECTED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlevoix Circuit Court case number 19-0658-26 filed by RHI Magnesita (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint and Jury Demand) (Worsfold, Charles) Modified text on 3/25/2019; this entry replaces #1 and #4 (mg). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re notice of filing notice of removal (mg) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying corporate parent LWB Holding Company by defendant RHI Magnesita (Worsfold, Charles) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (mg). (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#1

(#5) CORRECTED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlevoix Circuit Court case number 19-0658-26 filed by RHI Magnesita (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint and Jury Demand) (Worsfold, Charles) Modified text on 3/25/2019; this entry replaces #1 and #4 (mg). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) RESPONSE TO MOTION for leave to file a First Amended Complaint #26 filed by RHI Magnesita (Nalencz, Tara) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) RESPONSE TO MOTION for leave to file a First Amended Complaint #26 filed by IPEC, Inc. (Dombrowski, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) SUMMONS ISSUED as to third-party defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. (mg) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file a First Amended Complaint #26 filed by Kevin Edgecomb (Feldheim, Stuart) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file a First Amended Complaint #26 filed by Kevin Edgecomb (Feldheim, Stuart) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER regarding Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint #26 and certificate of concurrence; motion held in abeyance pending filing of certificate; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) PROPOSED SUMMONS for third party J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. filed by RHI Magnesita (Worsfold, Charles) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (mg). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. RHI Magnesita filed by RHI Magnesita (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Worsfold, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION for leave to file a First Amended Complaint by plaintiff Kevin Edgecomb; (Attachments: #1 Attachment First Amended Complaint Adding St. Marys Cement U.S. LLC as a New Party Defendant Pursuant to FRCP Rule 15) (Feldheim, Stuart) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Federal Rule 26(a)(1) by plaintiff Kevin Edgecomb (Feldheim, Stuart) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Charlevoix Circuit Court (mg) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order #6 , Mandatory E-Filing Letter #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Stuart M. Feldheim (mg) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LETTER from Clerk to attorney Stuart M. Feldheim regarding mandatory electronic filing (mg) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WRIT OF CERTIORARI; state court file to be sent by 4/9/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORRECTED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlevoix Circuit Court case number 19-0658-26 filed by RHI Magnesita (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint and Jury Demand) (Worsfold, Charles) Modified text on 3/25/2019; this entry replaces #1 and #4 (mg). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant RHI Magnesita in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4395948 (Worsfold, Charles) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORRECTED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlevoix Circuit Court case number 19-0658-26 filed by RHI Magnesita (Worsfold, Charles) Modified text on 3/25/2019; this entry replaced by #5 (mg). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re notice of filing notice of removal (mg) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying corporate parent LWB Holding Company by defendant RHI Magnesita (Worsfold, Charles) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (mg). (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlevoix Circuit Court case number 19-0658-26 filed by RHI Magnesita (Worsfold, Charles) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JT THORPE & SON INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Facilitative Mediator is a litigant