This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2022 at 08:51:00 (UTC).

Edge v. North American Electric Reliability Corporation

Case Summary

On November 19, 2021, Carter B. Edge (“Plaintiff”), represented by Clare H. Draper, IV of Alston & Bird, LLP, filed a civil rights lawsuit against North American Electric Reliability Corporation (“Defendant”), seeking compensatory and injunctive relief, damages including expenses and attorneys’ fees for the Defendant’s alleged intentional age discrimination in the terms and conditions of the Plaintiff’s employment, including but not limited to, his termination. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Northern District of Georgia with Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. and Judge Alan J. Baverman presiding. 

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “On or about January 1, 2017, the Plaintiff began his employment with Defendant as a Senior Engineer. On or about March 12, 2021, the Plaintiff was informed by his Steven Noess (approximately 43 years of age), Director of Regulatory Programs, that his employment was being terminated due to a “reduction in force” (“RIF”). In implementing its RIF, the Defendant grouped three (3) employees as Senior Engineer RA and Certification. The three (3) employees were the Plaintiff (age 52 at the time of the RIF), Robert Kenyon (age 74 at the time of the RIF), and, Clayton Calhoun (age 42 at the time of the RIF). In implementing the RIF, the Defendant did not rely upon objective criteria. In implementing the RIF, the Defendant deviated from its RIF criteria.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged, “In implementing the RIF, the Defendant terminated the oldest two (2) employees in the group, and retained the substantially younger employee. In implementing the RIF, the Defendant did not allow the Plaintiff to transfer to other open positions. Defendant terminated the Plaintiff for pretextually motivated reasons for the purpose of retaining and hiring substantially younger employees.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “The reasons for the Plaintiff’s termination are false and a pretext for age discrimination. The Plaintiff has been treated differently than similarly-situated employees in the terms and conditions of his employment because of his age. Defendant has engaged in illegal discrimination against the Plaintiff because of his age.”

 

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff is for the alleged violation of the ADEA – Age Discrimination, wherein the Plaintiff alleged that, Defendant has engaged in intentional age discrimination in the terms and conditions of the Plaintiff’s employment, including, but not limited to, his termination. Defendant’s conduct violates the ADEA.

 

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court to order Defendant to reinstate him and all benefits, including but not limited to, his bonuses and 410(K) contributions and grant full front pay, back pay and all the employment benefits he would have enjoyed had he not been discriminated against. Furthermore, the Plaintiff requested the Court to grant Plaintiff liquidated damages under the ADEA and Plaintiff’s expenses of litigation, including reasonable attorneys’ fees, pursuant to the ADEA and/or 42 U.S.C. § 1988. The Plaintiff also requested the Court to grant temporary, preliminary and permanent injunctive relief prohibiting Defendant from engaging in further discriminatory conduct. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04783

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

Referral Judges

Alan J. Baverman

Russell G. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carter B. Edge

Defendant

North American Electric Reliability Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

K. Prabhaker Reddy

Attorney at The Reddy Law Firm, PC

Suite 1506The Gates At Sugarloaf

Suwanee, GA 30024

Defendant Attorney

Clare H. Draper, IV

Suite 49001201 West Peachtree St.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carter B. Edge. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11408817) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/19/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Carter B. Edge. (jra) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to North American Electric Reliability Corporation. (jra) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-4783-TWT-JSA. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 11/22/2021. (anc) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-4783-TWT-RGV. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 11/30/2021. (anc) Modified on 11/30/2021 in order to correct reassignment information (anc). (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carter B. Edge. North American Electric Reliability Corporation waiver mailed on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022. (Reddy, K.) Modified on 12/17/2021 to edit text(jra). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction - North American Electric Reliability Corporation waiver mailed on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022. (jra) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carter B. Edge. North American Electric Reliability Corporation waiver mailed on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022. (Reddy, K.) Modified on 12/17/2021 to edit text(jra). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction re #5 Order Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard from Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand as referral judge. The presiding judge is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. (anc) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-4783-TWT-RGV. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 11/30/2021. (anc) Modified on 11/30/2021 in order to correct reassignment information (anc). (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by TWT. (jeh) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-4783-TWT-JSA. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 11/22/2021. (anc) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to North American Electric Reliability Corporation. (jra) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Carter B. Edge. (jra) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carter B. Edge. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11408817) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where North American Company for Life and Health Insurance is a litigant