This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2021 at 07:27:53 (UTC).

Edgar Vasquez v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Edgar Vasquez filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christina A. Snyder and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07176

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edgar Vasquez

San Pedro, CA 90733

Defendants

United States of America

Federal Bureau of Prisons

Michael Carvajal

Jose Santana

Felicia Ponce

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

4 #1

*Restricted*

4 #4

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) (car) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the Central District of California- Southern Division. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (rg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#2

(#2) Case Opening Letter to Edgar Vasquez. (dtg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/02/2021)

1 #2

Copy of Envelope

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Texas Western (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) (car) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the Central District of California- Southern Division. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (rg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Opening Letter to Edgar Vasquez. (dtg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Edgar Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Envelope)(dtg)***Modified TEXT on 9/1/2021 TO REFLECT CORRECT FILING DATE FROM 9/1/2021 TO 8/30/2021 (dtg).*** [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (dtg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketTHIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JASON K. PULLIAM. (dtg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 9/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Bureau of Prisons is a litigant