This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2022 at 19:40:32 (UTC).

Eddy County v. Allergan PLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 Eddy County filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Allergan PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-OP-45015

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eddy County

Defendants

Allergan PLC

Allergan Finance LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.

Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.

Walmart Inc.

Actavis plc

Actavis Inc

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Allergan Sales LLC

Allergan U.S.A., Inc.

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Warner Chilcott Company, LLC

Watson Pharma, Inc.

Actavis South Athlantic LLC

Actavis Elizabeth LLC

Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC

Actavis Totowa LLC

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Caren I Friedman

505 Cerrillos Rd. Suite A209

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Rosalind Bienvenu

Attorney at Kelly Durham & Pittard

505 Cerrillos Road

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Justin R. Kaufman

Attorney at Kelly Durham & Pittard

505 Cerrillos Road

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Other Attorneys

Thomas E. Rice, Jr.

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice - Kansas City

2400 E. Pershing Road

Kansas City, MO 64108

Francis A. Citera

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig - Chicago

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Gretchen N. Miller

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig - Chicago

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-216) by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster (MDL 2804). (kg) [Transferred from nmd on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 03/15/2022)

4 #4

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

4 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#7

(#7) Second Master Stipulation & Order Dismissing With Prejudice Plaintiff Subdivisions' Claims Against Janssen and Distributor Defendants. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/29/22. (P,R) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#8

(#8) Attorney Appearance by Francis A. Citera filed by on behalf of Albertson's LLC. (Citera, Francis) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Albertson's LLC. (Citera, Francis) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#10

(#10) Attorney Appearance by Gretchen N. Miller filed by on behalf of Albertson's LLC. (Miller, Gretchen) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Attorney Appearance by Gretchen N. Miller filed by on behalf of Albertson's LLC. (Miller, Gretchen) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Albertson's LLC. (Citera, Francis) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Attorney Appearance by Francis A. Citera filed by on behalf of Albertson's LLC. (Citera, Francis) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Second Master Stipulation & Order Dismissing With Prejudice Plaintiff Subdivisions' Claims Against Janssen and Distributor Defendants. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/29/22. (P,R) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Mexico. Case number 2:22-cv-00140. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-216) by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster (MDL 2804). (kg) [Transferred from nmd on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) [Transferred from nmd on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (dr) [Transferred from nmd on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketOffice code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr) [Transferred from nmd on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8137331 re #1 Complaint filed by Eddy County (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaufman, Justin) [Transferred from nmd on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Eddy County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaufman, Justin) [Transferred from nmd on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC (DE) is a litigant

Latest cases where Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WATSON PHARMA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant