This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2021 at 08:42:47 (UTC).

Eddie Malluk v. Penske Media Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Eddie Malluk filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Penske Media Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05923

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eddie Malluk

Defendant

Penske Media Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig B Sanders

Attorney at Barshay Sanders PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorney

William A Delgado

Attorney at DTO Law

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 2130

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for November 22, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Penske Media Corporation, identifying Penske Media Corporation, QBE Insurance Corporation, and Eddie Malluk. (Delgado, William) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Penske Media Corporation.(Delgado, William) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Penske Media Corporation answer now due 9/13/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Penske Media Corporation.(Attorney William A Delgado added to party Penske Media Corporation(pty:dft))(Delgado, William) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. See minute order for details. (lom) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eddie Malluk, upon Defendant Penske Media Corporation served on 7/23/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin Woods; Managing Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Penske Media Corporation. (ghap) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eddie Malluk, identifying Barshay Sanders, PLLC, Craig B. Sanders, Penske Media Corporation. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Eddie Malluk. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Eddie Malluk. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Eddie Malluk. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31672751 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Eddie Malluk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Attorney Craig B Sanders added to party Eddie Malluk(pty:pla))(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant