This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2020 at 09:54:29 (UTC).

Ecoverse Industries, LTD v. Terex Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Ecoverse Industries, LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Terex Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Solomon Oliver, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01596

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Solomon Oliver, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Ecoverse Industries, LTD

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Terex Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Keith A. Savidge

Attorney at Seeley, Savidge, Ebert & Gourash

26600 Detroit Road

Westlake, OH 44145

Jeffrey S. Moeller

Attorney at Seeley, Savidge, Ebert & Gourash

26600 Detroit Road

Westlake, OH 44145

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jennifer S. Roach

Attorney at Thompson Hine - Cleveland

3900 Key Tower, 127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Caitlin R. Thomas

Attorney at Thompson Hine - Cleveland

3900 Key Tower, 127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Answer to Counterclaim filed by Ecoverse Industries, LTD. Related document(s) #6 . (Savidge, Keith) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#10

(#10) Motion for extension of time until August 31, 2020 to Extend Answer Date on Counterclaim and to Stay other Pretrial Deadlines Pending Decision on Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Ecoverse Industries, LTD. (Savidge, Keith) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#9

(#9) Reply in support of #4 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Ecoverse Industries, LTD. (Savidge, Keith) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#8

(#8) Opposition to #4 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Terex Corporation. (Thomas, Caitlin) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#7

(#7) Certified copy of state court documents received from Lorain County Court of Common Pleas. (Y,A) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#6

(#6) Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Terex Corporation. (Roach, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ecoverse Industries, LTD. (Moeller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

4 #3

Exhibit 2 - Stipulated Dismissal and Judgment Entry

4 #2

Exhibit 1 - Confidential Settlement Agreement

4 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Hugh Fagan

#4

(#4) Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Ecoverse Industries, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Hugh Fagan, #2 Exhibit 1 - Confidential Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Stipulated Dismissal and Judgment Entry)(Savidge, Keith) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Terex Corporation. (Thomas, Caitlin) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit A. - Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal from Lorain County Court of Common Pleas, case number 20CV201321 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10116912. Filed by Terex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B. - Declaration of Alison Duncan) (Thomas, Caitlin) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Answer to Counterclaim filed by Ecoverse Industries, LTD. Related document(s) #6 . (Savidge, Keith) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #10 Motion for extension of time until August 31, 2020 to Extend Answer Date on Counterclaim and to Stay other Pretrial Deadlines Pending Decision on Motion to Remand. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 8/20/2020.(R,Sh) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion for extension of time until August 31, 2020 to Extend Answer Date on Counterclaim and to Stay other Pretrial Deadlines Pending Decision on Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Ecoverse Industries, LTD. (Savidge, Keith) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Reply in support of #4 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Ecoverse Industries, LTD. (Savidge, Keith) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Opposition to #4 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Terex Corporation. (Thomas, Caitlin) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certified copy of state court documents received from Lorain County Court of Common Pleas. (Y,A) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Terex Corporation. (Roach, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ecoverse Industries, LTD. (Moeller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Ecoverse Industries, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Hugh Fagan, #2 Exhibit 1 - Confidential Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Stipulated Dismissal and Judgment Entry)(Savidge, Keith) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketJudge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Terex Corporation. (Thomas, Caitlin) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Lorain County Court of Common Pleas, case number 20CV201321 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10116912. Filed by Terex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B. - Declaration of Alison Duncan) (Thomas, Caitlin) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ECOVERSE INDUSTRIES LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where TEREX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer S. Roach

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caitlin R. Thomas