This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2022 at 08:00:23 (UTC).

Ecos Energy, LLC v. Selective Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 Ecos Energy, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Selective Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah A. L. Merriam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01734

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah A. L. Merriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ecos Energy, LLC

Defendant

Selective Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Melone

Attorney at Allco Renewable Energy Limited

601 S Ocean Blvd

Delray Beach, FL 33483

Defendant Attorneys

Steven Lapp

Attorney at McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP

One State Street14Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

Adam Schwartz

Attorney at McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP

1300 Mount Kemble Avenuep.O. Box 2075

Morristown, NJ 07960-2075

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER. Joint Status Report due 5/19/2022. Discovery due May 17, 2023. Dispositive Motions due June 21, 2023. See attached order for important interim deadlines, discovery procedures, and other matters. The Court is unlikely to grant any extensions of these deadlines. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 2/18/2022. (McCallum, C.) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#18

(#18) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#17

(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ecos Energy, LLC. (Melone, Thomas) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Melone on behalf of Ecos Energy, LLC (Melone, Thomas) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Selective Insurance Company of America.(Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

12 #1

Removal Standing Order

12 #12

Main Document

#11

No Description Available

#10

(#10) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 12/30/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#9

(#9) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2022. Discovery due by 7/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/5/2022. Signed by Clerk on 12/30/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 20, 2022 to Respond to Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Lapp on behalf of Selective Insurance Company of America (Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selective Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. for Selective Insurance Company of America. (Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Selective Insurance Company of America (Notice to Counsel re: Local Rule 5(b) (Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Selective Insurance Company of America (Statement Pursuant to Standing Order) (Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • Docket(#23) ORDER regarding settlement: Judge Martinez will hold a telephonic conference on 3/15/22 at noon with counsel only to discuss the parties' readiness for mediation. Counsel shall email a dial-in number for the court's use to DFM_SETTLEMENT@CTD.USCOURTS.GOV. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 2/22/22.(Martinez, Donna) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Docket(#22) ORDER regarding settlement: This case has been referred to Judge Martinez "to determine whether settlement discussions, with the assistance of that Judge, would be productive and, if the Judge believes such discussions would be a productive use of Court time, to conduct such discussions." 20 To aid in that determination, Judge Martinez intends to have a telephone conference with counsel. By no later than 2/22/22, counsel shall email to DFM_SETTLEMENT@ctd.uscourts.gov three agreed-upon dates and times when they are available. The court will attempt to select from those agreed-upon proposed times in scheduling the telephone conference. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 2/18/22.(Martinez, Donna) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Docket(#21) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez for settlement purposes Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 2/18/2022.(Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Docket(#20) ORDER. This matter is hereby REFERRED to a United States Magistrate Judge to determine whether settlement discussions, with the assistance of that Judge, would be productive and, if the Judge believes such discussions would be a productive use of Court time, to conduct such discussions. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 2/18/2022.(McCallum, C.) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER. Joint Status Report due 5/19/2022. Discovery due May 17, 2023. Dispositive Motions due June 21, 2023. See attached order for important interim deadlines, discovery procedures, and other matters. The Court is unlikely to grant any extensions of these deadlines. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 2/18/2022. (McCallum, C.) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ecos Energy, LLC. (Melone, Thomas) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Melone on behalf of Ecos Energy, LLC (Melone, Thomas) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Selective Insurance Company of America.(Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/17/2022 (Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 12/30/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2022. Discovery due by 7/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/5/2022. Signed by Clerk on 12/30/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketJudge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 20, 2022 to Respond to Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Lapp on behalf of Selective Insurance Company of America (Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selective Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. for Selective Insurance Company of America. (Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Selective Insurance Company of America (Notice to Counsel re: Local Rule 5(b) (Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Selective Insurance Company of America (Statement Pursuant to Standing Order) (Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Selective Insurance Company of America (Notice of Pending Motions) (Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Selective Insurance Company of America from CT Superior Court, J.D. of New Haven, case number NNH-CV21-6119325-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6774570, filed by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Lapp, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selective Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Schwartz