This case was last updated from PACER on 11/20/2020 at 10:20:24 (UTC).

Eckola v. City of Green Bay K-9

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Eckola filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against City of Green Bay K-9. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William E Duffin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01474

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William E Duffin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allan Charles Eckola, Jr

Defendant

City of Green Bay K-9

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) REQUEST by Allan Charles Eckola, Jr for Extension to pay remaining filing fee. (Request is addressed in 10/27/2020 Screening Order, ECF No #7 ). (lz)

#8

(#8) JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/27/2020 DISMISSING case. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff)(lz)

#7

(#7) SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/27/2020 GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall collect from his institution trust account the $262.20 balance of the filing fee. This case is DISMISSED because The complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk of Court shall document that this inmate has incurred a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Sheriff-Brown County Detention Center; emailed to DLSFedOrdersEastCL@doj.state.wi.us) (lz)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER that on or before 10/14/2020 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 87.80 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/23/2020. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff)(lz)

#4

(#4) LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (lz)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Allan Charles Eckola, Jr. (lz) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against City of Green Bay K-9 by Allan Charles Eckola, Jr. (Filing Fee NOT PAID $400) (lz) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST by Allan Charles Eckola, Jr for Extension to pay remaining filing fee. (Request is addressed in 10/27/2020 Screening Order, ECF No #7 ). (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/27/2020 DISMISSING case. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff)(lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/27/2020 GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall collect from his institution trust account the $262.20 balance of the filing fee. This case is DISMISSED because The complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk of Court shall document that this inmate has incurred a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Sheriff-Brown County Detention Center; emailed to DLSFedOrdersEastCL@doj.state.wi.us) (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Allan Charles Eckola, Jr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketINITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $87.80, receipt number MK4689-084167. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER that on or before 10/14/2020 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 87.80 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/23/2020. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff)(lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Allan Charles Eckola, Jr. (lz) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Allan Charles Eckola, Jr. (lz) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against City of Green Bay K-9 by Allan Charles Eckola, Jr. (Filing Fee NOT PAID $400) (lz) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less