Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2019 at 07:50:09 (UTC).

Eckert v. Jarden Corporation, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 Eckert filed a Civil Right - Reapportionment lawsuit against Jarden Corporation, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy L. Brooks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02132

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Reapportionment

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dan H. Eckert

Defendants

Jarden Corporation, LLC

Newell Brands Inc.

Jarden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

M. Keith Blythe

Attorney at M. Keith Blythe, P.A.

3921 Rogers Avenue

Fort Smith, AR 72903

Defendant Attorneys

Mark A. Moll

Attorney at Jones, Jackson & Moll

401 North 7Th Street, P.O. Box 2023

Fort Smith, AR 72902-2023

J. Dalton Person

Attorney at Jones, Jackson, Moll, McGinnis & Stocks, PLC

401 North 7Th Street

Fort Smith, AR 72908

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. (lw) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Dan H. Eckert . (Blythe, M.) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint, by Jarden Corporation, LLC, Newell Brands Inc.. (Person, J. Dalton) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by Jarden Corporation, LLC, Newell Brands Inc.. (Person, J. Dalton) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Dalton Person on behalf of All Defendants. (Person, J. Dalton) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #3 Complaint against Newell Brands Inc., Jarden Corporation, LLC, filed by Dan H. Eckert. Related document: #3 Complaint filed by Dan H. Eckert. (Originally filed in the District Court of Sebastian County case CV19-1420 on 09/09/2019)(mjm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Jarden Corporation, LLC, Newell Brands Inc., filed by Dan H. Eckert. (Originally filed in the District Court of Sebastian County Case CV19-1420 on 09/05/2019)(mjm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Sebastian County, Arkansas, case number CV19-1420, filed by Newell Brands Inc., Jarden Corporation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings)(mjm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jarden Corporation, LLC, Newell Brands Inc.. (mjm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. (lw) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Dan H. Eckert . (Blythe, M.) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to all Defendants. New deadline to file answer or other responsive pleading is December 11, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 8, 2019. (ee) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint, by Jarden Corporation, LLC, Newell Brands Inc.. (Person, J. Dalton) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants' responsive pleading must be filed on or before NOVEMBER 11, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 25, 2019. (slc) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by Jarden Corporation, LLC, Newell Brands Inc.. (Person, J. Dalton) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2001818.. (Person, J. Dalton) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Dalton Person on behalf of All Defendants. (Person, J. Dalton) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (mjm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #3 Complaint against Newell Brands Inc., Jarden Corporation, LLC, filed by Dan H. Eckert. Related document: #3 Complaint filed by Dan H. Eckert. (Originally filed in the District Court of Sebastian County case CV19-1420 on 09/09/2019)(mjm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against Jarden Corporation, LLC, Newell Brands Inc., filed by Dan H. Eckert. (Originally filed in the District Court of Sebastian County Case CV19-1420 on 09/05/2019)(mjm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 10/23/2019.(mjm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Sebastian County, Arkansas, case number CV19-1420, filed by Newell Brands Inc., Jarden Corporation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings)(mjm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jarden Corporation, LLC, Newell Brands Inc.. (mjm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jarden Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Newell Brands DTC, Inc. is a litigant