This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:55:36 (UTC).

Eckard v. Langdon et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 Eckard filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Langdon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary Alice Theiler and John C Coughenour. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00579

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mary Alice Theiler

Presiding Judge

John C Coughenour

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gabriel Allen Eckard

Everett, WA 98201

Defendants

Alta Langdon

Jacob Taylor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Margaret Duncan

Attorney at SNOHOMISH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY (CIVIL)

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201-4046

Geoffrey A Enns

Attorney at SNOHOMISH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY (CIVIL)

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201-4046

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jacob Taylor mailed on 5/15/2019 (Enns, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Alta Langdon mailed on 5/15/2019 (Enns, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Geoffrey A Enns on behalf of Defendants Alta Langdon, Jacob Taylor. (Enns, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Served by 1st Class Mail to Alta Langdon; Jacob Taylor on 5/15/2019. (cc: plaintiff; Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney's Office)(ST) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Gabriel Allen Eckard against defendant(s) Alta Langdon, Jacob Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ST) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: plaintiff; Snohomish County Corrections)(ST) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#3

(#3) LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (sent to plaintiff via USPS) (ST) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

1 #5

Letter from Plaintiff

1 #4

Prison Trust Account

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Gabriel Eckard. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Prison Trust Account, #5 Letter from Plaintiff)(ST) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Margaret Duncan for Alta Langdon,Margaret Duncan for Jacob Taylor added; per #7 Notice of Appearance. (TH) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jacob Taylor mailed on 5/15/2019 (Enns, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Alta Langdon mailed on 5/15/2019 (Enns, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Geoffrey A Enns on behalf of Defendants Alta Langdon, Jacob Taylor. (Enns, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Served by 1st Class Mail to Alta Langdon; Jacob Taylor on 5/15/2019. (cc: plaintiff; Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney's Office)(ST) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Gabriel Allen Eckard against defendant(s) Alta Langdon, Jacob Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ST) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: plaintiff; Snohomish County Corrections)(ST) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (sent to plaintiff via USPS) (ST) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Gabriel Eckard. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Prison Trust Account, #5 Letter from Plaintiff)(ST) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margaret Duncan(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geoffrey A Enns