This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2021 at 12:30:19 (UTC).

Eck et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Eck filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are J P Stadtmueller and Stephen C Dries. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00097

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

J P Stadtmueller

Stephen C Dries

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bonnie eck Eck

Floyd Eck

Bonnie Eck

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua Greatsinger

Attorney at Mayer Graff & Wallace LLP

1425 Memorial Drive, Suite B

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Defendant Attorneys

Steven L Miracle

Attorney at Meissner Tierney Fisher & Nichols SC

111 E Kilbourn Ave - 19Th Fl

Milwaukee, WI 53202-6622

Mark D Malloy

Attorney at Meissner Tierney Fisher & Nichols SC

111 E Kilbourn Ave - 19Th Fl

Milwaukee, WI 53202-6622

 

Court Documents

20 #3

Exhibit List Exhibit C - Email exchange from May 2020 between State Farm and Pla

20 #2

Exhibit List Exhibit B - November 20, 2020 email from Plaintiff's Public Ad

20 #1

Exhibit List Exhibit A - Carl Schoenberger's June 11, 2020 Report

#20

#19

18 #6

Exhibit E - Miller Public Adjuster Estimate

18 #5

Exhibit D - Inspec's Report

18 #4

Exhibit C - March 5, 2020 correspondence

18 #3

Exhibit B - Estimate

18 #2

Exhibit A - Portion of Insurance Policy

#13

#6

#5

#4

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AFFIDAVIT of of Steven L. Miracle . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Exhibit A - Carl Schoenberger's June 11, 2020 Report, #2 Exhibit List Exhibit B - November 20, 2020 email from Plaintiff's Public Adjuster to State Farm, #3 Exhibit List Exhibit C - Email exchange from May 2020 between State Farm and Plaintiffs' public adjuster)(Malloy, Mark)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #13 MOTION to Bifurcate . (Malloy, Mark)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #13 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Plaintiffs' Bad Faith Claims. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua M. Greatsinger, #2 Exhibit A - Portion of Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Estimate, #4 Exhibit C - March 5, 2020 correspondence, #5 Exhibit D - Inspec's Report, #6 Exhibit E - Miller Public Adjuster Estimate, #7 Exhibit F - May 19, 2020 email correspondence, #8 Exhibit G - June 5, 2020 email correspondence, #9 Exhibit H - June 4, 2020 email correspondence, #10 Exhibit I - June 19, 2020 email correspondence, #11 Exhibit J - June 23, 2020 letter, #12 Exhibit K - June 9, 2020 email correspondence)(Greatsinger, Joshua)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 3/1/2021. (cc: all counsel)(amb)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 3/1/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2021, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 4/1/2021, Plaintiffs' Expert Witness List due by 5/31/2021, Discovery due by 8/31/2021, Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 10/30/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2021. (Tape #9:29 - 9:33) (amb)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AFFIDAVIT of Mark D. Malloy . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit July 12, 2019 Letter from State Farm to Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit July 20, 2019 letter from State Farm to Plaintiffs, #3 Exhibit Estimate Prepared by Energy Masters LLC, #4 Exhibit Estimate Prepared by Emergency Fire and Water Restoration, #5 Exhibit August 22, 2019 letter from State Farm to Plaintiffs, #6 Exhibit Revised estimate from Emergency Fire and Water Restoration provided 12/21/19, #7 Exhibit Revised estimate from Emergency Fire and Water Restoration provided 1/2/2020, #8 Exhibit January 10, 2020 letter from Miller Public Adjusters, #9 Exhibit January 25, 2020 letter from State Farm to Plaintiffs and Miller Public Adjusters, #10 Exhibit February 10, 2020 letter from State Farm to Plaintiffs, #11 Exhibit April 3, 2020 e-mail from Plaintiffs' public adjuster to State Farm, #12 Exhibit EFI Global Tree Impact Assessment, #13 Exhibit June 11, 2020 email from Ralph Nichols / Racine to Schoenberger, #14 Exhibit June 11, 2020 letter from EFI Global to State Farm, #15 Exhibit June 19, 2020 email from State Farm to Plaintiffs' public adjuster, #16 Exhibit June 23, 2020 letter from State Farm to Plaintiff's public adjuster, #17 Exhibit July 1, 2020 letter from Plaintiff's public adjuster to State Farm, #18 Exhibit July 20, 2020 letter from State Farm to Plaintiffs' public adjuster, #19 Exhibit July 21, 2020 email from Plaintiff's public adjuster to State Farm, #20 Exhibit July 30, 2020 letter from State Farm to Plaintiffs' public adjuster, #21 Exhibit August 27, 2020 email from State Farm to Plaintiffs' public adjuster, #22 Exhibit October 9, 2020 email from State Farm to Plaintiff's Public Adjustger, #23 Exhibit November 14, 2020 letter from State Farm to Plaintiffs' public adjuster, #24 Exhibit November 20, 2020 email from Plaintiffs' public adjuster to State Farm, #25 Exhibit January 16, 2021 email from Plaintiffs' public adjuster to State Farm)(Malloy, Mark)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEF in Support filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #13 MOTION to Bifurcate . (Malloy, Mark)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Bifurcate by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Malloy, Mark)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Malloy, Mark)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L Miracle on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven L. Miracle (Miracle, Steven)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge (Greatsinger, Joshua)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Greatsinger, Joshua)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #3 Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company ; Electronically filed documents should not be scanned whenever possible. All documents should contain an s/signature of the attorney who files the document. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Malloy, Mark)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Malloy, Mark)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Corrected Exhibit B to reflect change to incorrect date on initially filed Exhibit B (Malloy, Mark)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company ; The exhibits i.e state court documents to this document should have been filed as an attachment. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified (do not add addresses or punctuation)- please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (bx)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (bx)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Racine County, Case Number: 20CV1482 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3708509) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malloy, Mark)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Dennis Malloy