This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2021 at 10:10:51 (UTC).

Echard v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 Echard filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah D. Morrison, Kimberly A. Jolson and Michael H. Watson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05080

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

Presiding Judges

Sarah D. Morrison

Michael H. Watson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Echard

Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

Wells Fargo & Company

Intervenor

Pamela Delpapa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Meredith Crafton

Attorney at Smith & Lowney PLLC

2317 E John St

Seattle, WA 98112

Alyssa Koepfgen

Attorney at Smith and Lowney, PLLC

2317 East John Street

Seattle, WA 98112

Eric D Lowney

2317 E John St

Seattle, WA 98112

Marc Zemel

Attorney at Smith & Lowney PLLC

2317 E John St

Seattle, WA 98112

Savannah Rose

2317 E John St

Seattle, WA 98112

Nathan Andrew Hunter

Attorney at Hunter & Hunter LLC

1491 Polaris Pkwy #21416

Columbus, OH 43240

Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf

Attorney at Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP

1416 2Nd Street

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Eric D (Knoll) Lowney

Attorney at Smith & Lowney PLLC

2317 E John St

Seattle, WA 98112

Savannah Lee Rose

Attorney at Smith & Lowney PLLC

2317 E John St

Seattle, WA 98112

Knoll Lowney

2317 East John Street

Seattle, WA 98112

Defendant Attorneys

Franklin Dennis Cordell

Attorney at GORDON TILDEN THOMAS & CORDELL LLP

600 University Street, Ste 2915

Seattle, WA 98101

John Curtis Lynch

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

222 Central Park Avenuesuite 2000

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

Jason E Manning

222 Central Park Ave Ste 2200

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

Kalama M. Lui-Kwan

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Miles C Bludorn

Attorney at GORDON TILDEN THOMAS & CORDELL LLP

600 University Street, Ste 2915

Seattle, WA 98101

Elizabeth Holt Andrews

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

3 Embarcadero Centersuite 800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Donald Jeffrey Ireland

Attorney at Faruki Ireland Cox Rhinehart & Dusing PLL

110 N. Main Street, Suite 1600

Dayton, OH 45402

Jason Emmannuel Manning

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

222 Central Park Avenuesuite 2000

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

Stephen A Weigand

Attorney at Faruki Ireland Cox Rhinehart & Dusing PLL

201 East Fifth Street, Suite 1420

Cincinnati, OH 45202

William C. Mayberry

301 S. College St.34Th Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#88

(#88) RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Intervene and to Transfer or Stay filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Weigand, Stephen) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

87 #5

Exhibit E

87 #4

Exhibit D

87 #3

Exhibit C

87 #2

Exhibit B

87 #87

Main Document

71 #2

Exhibit 2

71 #1

Exhibit 1

71 #71

Main Document

#7

6 #1

Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

146 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Intervene and to Transfer or Stay filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Weigand, Stephen) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Intervene and to Transfer or Stay filed by Plaintiff Brian Echard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Hunter, Nathan) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Intervene and to Transfer or Stay filed by Plaintiff Brian Echard. (Hunter, Nathan) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) ORDER granting #84 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #71 MOTION to Intervene and to Transfer or Stay - Responses due by 12/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/23/2021. (kk2) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 12/10/2021. To File Responses to Motion to Intervene and to Transfer or Stay by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ireland, Donald) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) NOTATION ORDER granting #80 & #81 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William C. Mayberry and Jason E. Manning. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/12/2021. (er) (Entered: 11/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) NOTATION ORDER granting #78 & #79 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gretchen Freeman Cappio and Zachary Gussin. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/12/2021. (er) (Entered: 11/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8588902) of Jason E. Manning by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Weigand, Stephen) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8588898) of William C. Mayberry by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Weigand, Stephen) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8586106) of Zachary Gussin by Intervenor Pamela Delpapa. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wagoner, Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA re #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Cordell, Franklin) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/19/2021.] (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/7/2021, (Cordell, Franklin) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/19/2021.] (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Franklin Dennis Cordell on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Cordell, Franklin) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/19/2021.] (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant All Defendants (Englebrecht, Alyssa) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/19/2021.] (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docket***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Jury Trial 4/5/21 terminated, docketed in error. (GT) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/19/2021.] (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDISREGARD - DOCKETED IN ERROR.NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING TIME. The Hearing time has been changed: Jury Trial is set for 4/5/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(GT) Modified on 2/1/2021 (GT). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/19/2021.] (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/19/2021.] (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Wells Fargo Bank NA)(RE) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/19/2021.] (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketU.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (RE) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/19/2021.] (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6907711), filed by Brian Echard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Englebrecht, Alyssa) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/19/2021.] (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Carter Mayberry

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kalama M. Lui-kwan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth H. Andrews