This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2020 at 10:16:53 (UTC).

eCeipt LLC v. Bath & Body Works, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 eCeipt LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Bath Body Works, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00754

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

eCeipt LLC

Defendant

Bath & Body Works, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

100 Congress Ave, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bath & Body Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Bath & Body Works, LLC. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Bath & Body Works, LLC(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by eCeipt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Bath & Body Works, LLC. (am) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by eCeipt LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by eCeipt LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13877082), filed by eCeipt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Bath & Body Works, LLC answer due 10/29/2020. (am) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 29, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bath & Body Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Bath & Body Works, LLC. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Bath & Body Works, LLC(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Bath & Body Works, LLC answer due 10/15/2020. (am) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiff's Motion to extend the time for Defendant to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 15, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 09/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by eCeipt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Bath & Body Works, LLC. (am) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by eCeipt LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by eCeipt LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13877082), filed by eCeipt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where eCeipt LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BATH & BODY WORKS DIRECT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond W Mort, III