This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2020 at 07:34:07 (UTC).

E.C. v. Chart Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 E C filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Chart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-04984

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E.C.

Defendant

Chart Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Marie Zeman

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

505 14Th Street, Suite 1110

Oakland, CA 94612

Eric H. Gibbs

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

505 14Th Street, Suite 1110

Oakland, CA 94612

Adam E. Polk

Attorney at Girard Sharp LLP

601 California Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94108

Steven M. Tindall

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

505 14Th Street, Suite 1110

Oakland, CA 94612

Jordan S. Elias

Attorney at Girard Sharp LLP

601 California Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94108

Christina C. Sharp

Attorney at Girard Sharp LLP

601 California Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94108

Dylan Hughes

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

505 14Th Street, Suite 1110

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by E.C... (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 8/11/2020) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Chart Inc. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting (495) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:18-cv-01586-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by E.C. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Chart Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14731793.). Filed byE.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by E.C... (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 8/11/2020) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting (495) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:18-cv-01586-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Chart Inc. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/7/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by E.C. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Chart Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14731793.). Filed byE.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chart Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where EC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dylan Hughes(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy M Zeman