This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2023 at 06:02:37 (UTC).

Ebrahimi v. Fields et al

Case Summary

On February 8, 2023, Shamim Ebrahimic (“Plaintiff”), self-represented, filed a civil rights lawsuit against Michael R. Fields, Netflix, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., The Allstate Corporation, Pizza Hut, Domino's Pizza, Inc., Uber Technologies, Inc., and others (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief and damages for alleged violation of Texas Code. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas, with Judge Ed Kinkeade presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged, “Plaintiff and almost every listed Defendant have no personal relationship. As a matter of fact, Plaintiff has exchanged more than a hundred words with less than a handful of the nearly quadruple digit number of Defendants and, even then, Plaintiff has not communicated with those few individuals in over six years.

The plaintiff then alleged, “Defendants—primarily through Azita Erfani and Michael R. Fields—have subjected Plaintiff to no less than 5,000 known actionable events, dating back to approximately the year 2000 or when Plaintiff was sixteen years old and continuing to present day.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “Those 5,000 actionable events do not include the over 330 simulated attorney-client cases, the over 5,000 phone calls and text message exchanged along with those simulated cases, the over 2,000 e-mails exchanged in association with those simulated cases, or the over 15,000 fraudulent government documents in association with those simulated cases—all of which occurred between 2014 and 2019.”

Plaintiff additionally alleged, “Those 5,000 actionable events also do not include the over 5,700 e-mail threads exchanged on the Harris County Criminal Lawyers Association (‘HCCLA’) listserve between September 2017 and July 2019 alone, approximately 1/3rd of which were composed and published with the intention of harassing Plaintiff and/ or dissuading him from reporting the commission of criminal offenses.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “Plaintiff has satisfied the legal definition of a disabled individual since November 25, 2014, having suffered a severe traumatic brain injury two days prior.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “No Defendant has had the legal authority to disrupt Plaintiff in the enjoyment of his protected legal rights. No Defendant has been legally justified in committing acts in violation of the law. Defendants’ acts influenced official proceedings, influenced the reporting of the commission of a federal offense to a federal officer of the law, and influenced government policy.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “Defendants materially breached their duties to Plaintiff, made material misrepresentations to Plaintiff with the intent that Plaintiff act thereupon to which he did, prevented Plaintiff from acquiring information likely to affect his judgment in matters, and failed to correct their false impressions knowing them not to be true.”

Plaintiff presented several claims for relief, including for the alleged violations of Tex. Code Jud. Conduct, Canons 1, 2A, 2B, 2C, 3A, 3B(1), 3B(2), 3B(3), 3B(5), 3B(6), 3B(7), 3B(8), 3B(9), 3B(11), 3C(1), 3C(2), 3C(3), 3C(4), 3D(1), 3D(2), 4A(1), 4A(2), 4C(1), 4D(1), 4D(4), 4I, 5(1)(ii), 5(4), 6, and 6H; Tex. Disciplinary R. Prof'l Conduct 8.03(a) and (b), 8.04(a)(1), 8.04(a)(3), 8.04(a)(2), 8.04(a)(4), 8.04(a)(9), 8.04(a)(5), 8.04(a)(6), 8.04(a)(12), 1.01(b), 3.01, 3.03, 3.04(b), 3.09, 4.01, 5.01, 5.08, 7.02, and 7.03; and Fed. Code of Conduct for United States Judges, Canons 1, 2, and 3.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested injunctive and declaratory relief along with an award of damages, including exemplary damages with pre- and post-judgment interest.  

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00273

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

Referral Judge

Irma Carrillo Ramirez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shamim Ebrahimi

Defendants

The Allstate Corporation

Pizza Hut

Hormel Foods Corporation

Boston Beer Company

Anheuser-Busch Companies

The Coca-Cola Company

The Procter & Gamble Company

318 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shamim Ebrahimi

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Shamim Ebrahimi. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ebrahimi, Shamim) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shamim Ebrahimi (Ebrahimi, Shamim) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (acm) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#5

(#5) Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:23-cv-273-K-BH. (frw) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting the #2 Application to Proceed In District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/14/2023) (mcrd) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND Summons in a Civil Action against All Defendants filed by Shamim Ebrahimi. Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Additional Page(s) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint - Parties to Suit, #3 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 - List of Law Violations, #4 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Exhibit 2 - List of Duties and Representations, #5 Additional Page(s) Notice to Cease and Desist) (Ebrahimi, Shamim) (Entered: 03/11/2023)

7 #1

Additional Page(s) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

7 #2

Additional Page(s) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint - Parties to Suit

7 #3

Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 - List of Law Violations

7 #4

Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Exhibit 2 - List of Duties and Representations

7 #5

Additional Page(s) Notice to Cease and Desist

#8

(#8) Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation: Based on the relevant filings and applicable law, this case should be DISMISSED as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/18/2023) (mcrd) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #8 Findings and Recommendations on Case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/3/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#10

(#10) JUDGMENT - The plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/3/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

2 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JUDGMENT - The plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/3/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #8 Findings and Recommendations on Case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/3/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation: Based on the relevant filings and applicable law, this case should be DISMISSED as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/18/2023) (mcrd) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND Summons in a Civil Action against All Defendants filed by Shamim Ebrahimi. Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Additional Page(s) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint - Parties to Suit, #3 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 - List of Law Violations, #4 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Exhibit 2 - List of Duties and Representations, #5 Additional Page(s) Notice to Cease and Desist) (Ebrahimi, Shamim) (Entered: 03/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting the #2 Application to Proceed In District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/14/2023) (mcrd) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:23-cv-273-K-BH. (frw) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • Docket(#4) Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused pursuant to Special Order 3-346. Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver assigned for matters that may be referred in this case. (axm) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (acm) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shamim Ebrahimi (Ebrahimi, Shamim) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Shamim Ebrahimi. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ebrahimi, Shamim) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less