Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2021 at 09:59:19 (UTC).

EB Holdings II, Inc. et al v. Illinois National Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 EB Holdings II, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Illinois National Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy J. Koppe and James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02248

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EB Holdings II, Inc.

QXH II, Inc.

Defendants

Illinois National Insurance Company

Continental Casualty Company

Federal Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Talitha Gray Kozlowski

Attorney at Garman Turner Gordon

7251 Amigo Street, Suite 210

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Dylan T. Ciciliano

Attorney at Garman Turner Gordon LLP

7251 Amigo Street, Suite 210

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Gregory E Garman

Attorney at Garman Turner Gordon

7251 Amigo Street, Suite 210

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Shara Lynn Larson

Attorney at Ghandi Deeter Blackham

725 S. 8Th Street, Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Thomas E. Birsic

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

210 Sixth Ave.

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-2613

Paul Fuener

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

210 Sixth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15213

Jessica Moran

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

210 Sixth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-2613

Nedda Ghandi

Attorney at Ghandi Deeter Blackham

725 South 8Th Street Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorneys

Carleton R. Burch

Attorney at Anderson, McPharlin & Conners LLP

601 S. Seventh Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Janiece S. Marshall

Attorney at Anderson McPharlin & Conners LLP

601 South Seventh Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Chad C. Butterfield

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

6689 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Charles C. Lemley

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP

1776 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-2304

Jeffrey D. Olster

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd., Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89118

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) ORDER granting #17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Charles C. Lemley and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad C. Butterfield. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/27/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #17 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Continental Casualty Company. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Butterfield, Chad) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#32

(#32) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Illinois National Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Burch, Carleton) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#31

(#31) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Illinois National Insurance Company.(Burch, Carleton) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#30

(#30) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Federal Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings, Inc. for Federal Insurance Company added. (Olster, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#29

(#29) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Federal Insurance Company.(Olster, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#28

(#28) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Continental Casualty Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate CNA Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Loews Corporation, Other Affiliate The Continental Corporation for Continental Casualty Company added. (Butterfield, Chad) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#27

(#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Continental Casualty Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/1/2021.(Butterfield, Chad) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#17

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Federal Insurance Company by Plaintiffs EB Holdings II, Inc., QXH II, Inc.. (Kozlowski, Talitha) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Continental Casualty Company by Plaintiffs EB Holdings II, Inc., QXH II, Inc.. (Kozlowski, Talitha) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Illinois National Insurance Company by Plaintiffs EB Holdings II, Inc., QXH II, Inc.. (Kozlowski, Talitha) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by EB Holdings II, Inc., QXH II, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Howard Meyers, Other Affiliate Rose-Marie Meyers for QXH II, Inc.; Corporate Parent EBT Newco, LLC, Other Affiliate GoldenTree Asset Management Lux S.A.R.I. for EB Holdings II, Inc. added. (Kozlowski, Talitha) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#26) ORDER granting #24 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint, Continental Casualty Company answer due 1/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER granting #17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Charles C. Lemley and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad C. Butterfield. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/27/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #17 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Continental Casualty Company. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Butterfield, Chad) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Illinois National Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Burch, Carleton) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Illinois National Insurance Company.(Burch, Carleton) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Federal Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings, Inc. for Federal Insurance Company added. (Olster, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Federal Insurance Company.(Olster, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Continental Casualty Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate CNA Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Loews Corporation, Other Affiliate The Continental Corporation for Continental Casualty Company added. (Butterfield, Chad) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Continental Casualty Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/1/2021.(Butterfield, Chad) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #24 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint, Continental Casualty Company answer due 1/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER denying #17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Petitioner shall refile a petition on the form furnished by the clerk in compliance with LR IA 11-2(a) within fourteen (14) days from the entry of this order. If petitioner does not comply with this 14-day deadline, he shall again pay the admission fee for any refiled verified petition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by EB Holdings II, Inc., QXH II, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, #7 Summons Issued. Federal Insurance Company served on 12/18/2020. (Kozlowski, Talitha) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by EB Holdings II, Inc., QXH II, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, #7 Summons Issued. Illinois National Insurance Company served on 12/16/2020. (Kozlowski, Talitha) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (HAM) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Paul Fuener and Thomas E. Birsic to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/28/2020. (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Federal Insurance Company by Plaintiffs EB Holdings II, Inc., QXH II, Inc.. (Kozlowski, Talitha) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Continental Casualty Company by Plaintiffs EB Holdings II, Inc., QXH II, Inc.. (Kozlowski, Talitha) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Illinois National Insurance Company by Plaintiffs EB Holdings II, Inc., QXH II, Inc.. (Kozlowski, Talitha) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by EB Holdings II, Inc., QXH II, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Howard Meyers, Other Affiliate Rose-Marie Meyers for QXH II, Inc.; Corporate Parent EBT Newco, LLC, Other Affiliate GoldenTree Asset Management Lux S.A.R.I. for EB Holdings II, Inc. added. (Kozlowski, Talitha) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6290516) by EB Holdings II, Inc., QXH II, Inc.. Proof of service due by 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Kozlowski, Talitha) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QXH II, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Illinois National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Continental Casualty Company is a litigant