This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/30/2022 at 10:02:37 (UTC).

EATON v. PLASSE et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2022 EATON filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against PLASSE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Mario Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00379

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Mario Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARSENIO EATON

Terre Haute, IN 47802

Defendants

JOHN PLASSE

MELISSA

COX

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by U.S. Mail. (MEH) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through October 11, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the 402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). A form motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee is being provided for your use. NOTE TO PRISONER - If you seek leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee, and you are a prisoner, your motion must be accompanied by a copy of the transactions associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. Copies to plaintiff by U.S. Mail. (Attachments: #1 Form Motion for IFP) (MEH) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

4 #1

Form Motion for IFP

#5

(#5) MOTION to Change Venue, filed by Plaintiff ARSENIO EATON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KAA) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

5 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through October 17, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the 402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). A form motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee is being provided for your use. NOTE TO PRISONER - If you seek leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee, and you are a prisoner, your motion must be accompanied by a copy of the transactions associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. Copies to plaintiff by U.S. Mail. (Attachments: #1 Form Motion for IFP) (MEH) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

6 #1

Form Motion for IFP

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ARSENIO EATON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(JRB) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

7 #1

Exhibit

7 #2

Envelope

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through November 23, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. Copy to plaintiff by U.S. Mail. (MEH) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through November 23, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. Copy to plaintiff by U.S. Mail. (MEH) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ARSENIO EATON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(JRB) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through October 17, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the 402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). A form motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee is being provided for your use. NOTE TO PRISONER - If you seek leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee, and you are a prisoner, your motion must be accompanied by a copy of the transactions associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. Copies to plaintiff by U.S. Mail. (Attachments: #1 Form Motion for IFP) (MEH) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Change Venue, filed by Plaintiff ARSENIO EATON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KAA) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through October 11, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the 402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). A form motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee is being provided for your use. NOTE TO PRISONER - If you seek leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee, and you are a prisoner, your motion must be accompanied by a copy of the transactions associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. Copies to plaintiff by U.S. Mail. (Attachments: #1 Form Motion for IFP) (MEH) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by U.S. Mail. (MEH) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against COX, MELISSA, JOHN PLASSE, filed by ARSENIO EATON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TPS) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cox, A/K/A Mary Frances is a litigant

Latest cases where MELISSA A ALDAWQI TRUSTEE OF THE STOTLER TRUST is a litigant