This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:36:14 (UTC).

Eastover Insurance Group, LLC v. Ohio Security Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 Eastover Insurance Group, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Ohio Security Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda R. Anderson and Henry T. Wingate. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00198

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda R. Anderson

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eastover Insurance Group, LLC

Defendant

Ohio Security Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

S. Craig Panter

Attorney at PANTER LAW FIRM, PLLC

7736 Old Canton Road, Suite B, P. O. Box 2310 (39139)

Madison, MS 39110

Defendant Attorneys

James W Shelson

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR, LLP - Jackson

P. O. Box 16114, 4270 I-55 North (39211)

Jackson, MS 39236-6114

Nash E. Gilmore

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR, LLP - Jackson

P. O. Box 16114, 4270 I-55 North (39211)

Jackson, MS 39236-6114

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court having been notified that the parties have settled, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 05/15/19 (KNS) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#10

(#10) Response in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Strike CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Eastover Insurance Group, LLC (Panter, S.), #7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Strike CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Eastover Insurance Group, LLC (Panter, S.) filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company (Shelson, James) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Gilmore, Nash) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Nash E. Gilmore on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company (Gilmore, Nash) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Strike CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Eastover Insurance Group, LLC (Panter, S.) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Strike CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Eastover Insurance Group, LLC (Panter, S.) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Eastover Insurance Group, LLC (Panter, S.) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against Ohio Security Insurance Company, filed by Eastover Insurance Group, LLC.(Panter, S.) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#3

(#3) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Shelson, James) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Declaration

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - 2019 LLC Annual Report

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ohio Security Insurance Company from County Court of Rankin County, case number 61CO1:19-cv-362. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3946558) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2019 LLC Annual Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court having been notified that the parties have settled, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 05/15/19 (KNS) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • NOTICE of Settlement: The parties advised, per 4-18-19 email, a settlement has been reached in this matter. The parties shall submit an agreed order of dismissal to the District Judge within 30 days. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Response in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Strike CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Eastover Insurance Group, LLC (Panter, S.), #7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Strike CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Eastover Insurance Group, LLC (Panter, S.) filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company (Shelson, James) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Gilmore, Nash) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Nash E. Gilmore on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company (Gilmore, Nash) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Strike CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Eastover Insurance Group, LLC (Panter, S.) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Strike CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Eastover Insurance Group, LLC (Panter, S.) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Eastover Insurance Group, LLC (Panter, S.) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against Ohio Security Insurance Company, filed by Eastover Insurance Group, LLC.(Panter, S.) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Shelson, James) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ohio Security Insurance Company from County Court of Rankin County, case number 61CO1:19-cv-362. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3946558) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2019 LLC Annual Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.