This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2020 at 07:53:32 (UTC).

Easton v. Brennan

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 Easton filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Brennan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01852

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Easton

Charnae Easton

Defendants

Brennan

Megan J. Brennan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katherine Mallak Wutchiett

Attorney at Legal Aid at Work

180 Montgomery St.

San Francisco, CA 94104

Julia C Parish

Attorney at Legal Aid at Work

180 Montgomery Street, Suite 600

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Megan J. Brennan. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

5 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that Gener al Order if applicable. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#4

(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Charnae Easton (Amended). (Wutchiett, Katherine) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Wutchiett, Katherine) (Filed on 3/16/2020) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Megan J. Brennan ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14284399.). Filed byCharnae Easton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wutchiett, Katherine) (Filed on 3/16/2020) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Megan J. Brennan. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that Gener al Order if applicable. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Charnae Easton (Amended). (Wutchiett, Katherine) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/31/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. The Civil Cover Sheet was recently revised. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19).< /b< Please complete correct Civil Cover Sheet and e-file an an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings < Other Documents < Civil Cover Sheet. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Wutchiett, Katherine) (Filed on 3/16/2020) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Megan J. Brennan ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14284399.). Filed byCharnae Easton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wutchiett, Katherine) (Filed on 3/16/2020) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Easton Ice Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Brennan is a litigant